Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801124

EP2801124 - CALCULATED COMPENSATED MAGNETIC ANTENNAS FOR DIFFERENT FREQUENCIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.05.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 28.06.2017  [2017/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HID Global GmbH
Am Klingenweg 6A
65396 Walluf / DE
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / KASTNER, Jurgen
Am Sandbach 25
A-4070 Eferding / AT
02 / PIRCH, Hans-Juergen
Hasnerstrasse 13-15 Top9
A-4020 Linz / AT
03 / PRETSCHUH, Markus
Einsiedl 8/14
A-4470 Enns / AT
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]01 / KASTNER, Jurgen
Am Sandbach 25
A-4070 Eferding / AT
02 / PIRCH, Hans-Juergen
Pochestrasse 1/3
A-4020 Linz / AT
03 / PRETSCHUH, Markus
Einsiedl 8/14
A-4470 Enns / AT
Representative(s)Grosfillier, Philippe
ANDRE ROLAND S.A.
P.O. Box 5107
1002 Lausanne / CH
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]Grosfillier, Philippe
ANDRE ROLAND SA
P.O. Box 5107
1002 Lausanne / CH
Application number, filing date13712902.907.01.2013
WO2013IB00434
Priority number, dateUS201261583518P05.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261583518 P
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013117994
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801124
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/22, G06K7/10, H01Q5/00, H01Q7/00, H01Q21/00
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
Extension statesBA04.08.2014
ME04.08.2014
TitleGerman:BERECHNETE KOMPENSIERTE MAGNETISCHE ANTENNEN FÜR UNTERSCHIEDLICHE FREQUENZEN[2014/46]
English:CALCULATED COMPENSATED MAGNETIC ANTENNAS FOR DIFFERENT FREQUENCIES[2014/46]
French:ANTENNES MAGNÉTIQUES COMPENSÉES PAR CALCUL POUR DIFFÉRENTES FRÉQUENCES[2014/46]
Entry into regional phase04.08.2014National basic fee paid 
04.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
18.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.05.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO9718601  (ALLGON AB [SE]; OESTERWALL TORSTEN [SE]) [X] 1,2,4,11 * page 4, line 5 - page 8, line 28 * [I] 6-9,12-15;
 [X]EP0186483  (SENELCO LTD [GB]) [X] 15 * page 2, line 2 - page 4, line 17 *;
 [X]EP1227024  (ALSTOM [FR] ALSTOM TRANSPORT SA [FR]) [X] 15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0022] * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2008191955  (MANHOLM LARS [SE] ET AL) [A] 4,5 * paragraphs [0036] - [0042] * * figure 1 *;
 [AD]US7439862  (QUAN RALPH W [US]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * column 13, lines 3-37 * * figures 4A,B *
by applicantUS7439862
 US8063746