Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2826272

EP2826272 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR BACKHAUL SHARING BY FEMTOCELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.03.2018
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2015/04]
Inventor(s)01 / SINGH, Damanjit
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
02 / TINNAKORNSRISUPHAP, Peerapol
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
03 / PATEL, Chirag Sureshbhai
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
04 / YAVUZ, Mehmet
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
05 / DAS, Soumya
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
06 / RADULESCU, Andrei Dragos
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2015/04]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/04]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date13712997.913.03.2013
WO2013US31056
Priority number, dateUS201261610351P13.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261610351 P
US20131379764312.03.2013         Original published format: US201313797643
[2015/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013138521
Date:19.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2826272
Date:21.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2013
[2015/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W16/14, H04W72/12
[2015/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/04]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR BACKHAUL-SHARING DURCH FEMTOZELLEN[2015/04]
English:METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR BACKHAUL SHARING BY FEMTOCELLS[2015/04]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL DE PARTAGE DE LIAISON PAR FEMTOCELLULES[2015/04]
Entry into regional phase28.08.2014National basic fee paid 
28.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/04]
23.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.03.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
07.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
08.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2009023581  (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-34 * abstract * * paragraphs [3]-[8], [29]-[30], [34]-[41],[45]-[46],[52]-[53], [74],[99]-[101];; figure 12; claims 1,3 *;
 [I]WO2009050212  (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [I] 1-34 * abstract * * page 1, lines 5-8;page 5, line 31 - page 6, lin17; page 9, lines 21-33;; claims 1,12 *;
 [A]WO2011115672  (CHEN HOU-SHIN [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * abstract * * page 2, lines 1-5; page 3, lines 17-24; page 9, lines 13-16;; figures 5,6,7; claims 1,4 *;
 [A]WO2008115897  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * abstract * * paragraphs [9],[16],[43]-[44];; figure 5; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2008219213  (NATARAJAN KADATHUR S [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * abstract * * paragraph [12], [26]-[44];; figure 2; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO2009024843  (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-34 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2009040713  (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-34 * abstract *;
 [X]US2009238207  (ZHAO XIAOMING [US], et al) [X] 35-50 * paragraphs [0016] - [0017] - [0028] - [0029]; claims 1-6 *;
 [XI]US6473400  (MANNING G KEITH [GB]) [X] 51,62,66,73 * abstract * * col. 1, line 40 - col. 2, line 35 * [I] 52-61,63-65,67-69,71-73;
 [A]EP1279259  (TELIA AB [SE]) [A] 51-73 * abstract *;
 [A]  - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Telecommunication management; Charging management; Packet Switched (PS) domain charging (3GPP TS 32.251 version 7.5.1 Release 7); ETSI TS 132 251", IEEE, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20071001), vol. 3-SA5;3-CT5, no. V7.5.1, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014040189 [A] 51-73 * section 5.1.1, 5.1.2 *