Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2830557

EP2830557 - APPARATUSES AND METHODS FOR MAKING ABSORBENT ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.07.2018
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2015/06]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHNEIDER, Uwe
520 Chisholm Trail
Cincinnati, Ohio 45215 / US
02 / LAVON, Gary, Dean
7071 Darcie Drive
Liberty Township, Ohio 45011 / US
 [2015/06]
Representative(s)P&G Patent Germany
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Straße 40
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/06]Mather, Peter Geoffrey
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA
100 Temselaan
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date13713055.518.03.2013
[2016/23]
WO2013US32738
Priority number, dateUS20121343524730.03.2012         Original published format: US201213435247
[2015/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013148381
Date:03.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2830557
Date:04.02.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013
[2015/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2830557
Date:08.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15
[2015/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SAUGFÄHIGEN ARTIKELS[2015/06]
English:APPARATUSES AND METHODS FOR MAKING ABSORBENT ARTICLES[2015/06]
French:APPAREILS ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION D'ARTICLES ABSORBANTS[2015/06]
Entry into regional phase13.08.2014National basic fee paid 
13.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/06]
05.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.04.2016Fee for grant paid
22.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.01.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.03.2017  27.03.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 02  08.03.2017  27.03.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Essity Hygiene and Health Aktiebolag
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2018/26]
Opponent(s)01  07.03.2017  27.03.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 02  08.03.2017  27.03.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Essity Hygiene and Health Aktiebolag
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2018/25]
Opponent(s)01  07.03.2017  27.03.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 02  08.03.2017  27.03.2017  ADMISSIBLE
Essity Hygiene and Health Aktiebolag
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2017/15]
Opponent(s)01  07.03.2017   
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 02  08.03.2017   
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
18.04.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.08.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.06.2018Date of oral proceedings
16.07.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.07.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition14.09.2018Appeal received No.  T2306/18
15.10.2018Statement of grounds filed
21.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.03.2013
AL08.06.2016
AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
BG08.06.2016
CY08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
MK08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
IE18.03.2017
LU18.03.2017
MT18.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]HU18.03.2013
AL08.06.2016
AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
BG08.06.2016
CY08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
IE18.03.2017
LU18.03.2017
MT18.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2019/39]HU18.03.2013
AL08.06.2016
AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
BG08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
IE18.03.2017
LU18.03.2017
MT18.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2019/31]HU18.03.2013
AL08.06.2016
AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
IE18.03.2017
LU18.03.2017
MT18.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/46]AL08.06.2016
AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
IE18.03.2017
LU18.03.2017
MT18.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/43]AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
IE18.03.2017
LU18.03.2017
MT18.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/13]AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
IE18.03.2017
LU18.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/10]AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
LU18.03.2017
FR31.03.2017
Former [2018/07]AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
FR31.03.2017
Former [2018/01]AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
MC08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
Former [2017/37]AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
DK08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SI08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
Former [2017/11]AT08.06.2016
BE08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
SM08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
PT10.10.2016
Former [2017/10]BE08.06.2016
CZ08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
PL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
SK08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
IS08.10.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ08.06.2016
EE08.06.2016
ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
IT08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
RO08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
NL08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
SE08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
GR09.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES08.06.2016
FI08.06.2016
HR08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
LV08.06.2016
RS08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
Former [2016/49]FI08.06.2016
LT08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
Former [2016/46]LT08.06.2016
NO08.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]US2004158217  (WU LANYING Z [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0093] - [0102]; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US2004035521  (NAKAKADO MASAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0062]; figure 12 *;
 [A]US2005230037  (JENQUIN PETER J [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0027] - [0031]; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]EP2415430  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [A] 1,5-8 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US2008028902  (BAGGOT JAMES LEO [US], et al) [A] 12 * paragraph [0040] *;
 [A]GB2106441  (MOLINS PLC [GB]) [A] 12 * page 1, lines 52-63 *
by applicantUS5628097
 US5916661
 US6545197
 US6107539
 US4610678
 US4673402
 US4888231
 US4834735
 US5599335
 US5562646
 US5669894
 US6790798
 US2004158212
 US2004097895
 US3860003
 US4909803
 US4695278
 US4795454
 US4704115
 US2009312730
 US7569039
 US5745922
 US2005107764
 US2012061016
 US2012061015
 US5393360
 US7708849
 US7861756
 US7777094
 US7587966
 US6248195
 US6546987
 US7383865
 US2012021186
OppositionEP1300124
 US7530972
 EP2450015
 JP2004229857
 US2008028902
 US2003089447
 US8128609
 US7861756
 JP2002273808
 JP2000026015
 US2005257881