Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2807119 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2807119



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 241
27.09.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
24.11.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
27.10.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.10.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
11.10.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
11.10.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
11.10.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
01.06.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
01.06.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
01.06.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
01.06.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
10.05.2016 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
25.01.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
25.01.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 13
25.01.2016 Claims Search / examination 3
25.01.2016 Description Search / examination 12
25.01.2016 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
17.09.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
17.09.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
17.09.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
17.09.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 17
18.08.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
09.04.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
09.04.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
02.04.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
05.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
30.09.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
23.09.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 4
03.09.2014 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
01.09.2014 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
28.08.2014 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
27.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
23.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
23.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
06.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
20.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
20.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 20
01.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
01.08.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 18
04.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
04.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
04.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
21.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs PCT receiving Office 1
23.01.2013 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
23.01.2013 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
23.01.2013 Description PCT receiving Office 12
23.01.2013 Drawings PCT receiving Office 1
23.01.2013 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 19