Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2807119

Designated contracting statesAL 
 ATLapse: 23.11.2016
 BELapse: 23.11.2016
 BGLapse: 23.02.2017
 CHLapse: 31.01.2017
CYLapse: 23.11.2016
 CZLapse: 23.11.2016
 DE 
 DKLapse: 23.11.2016
 EELapse: 23.11.2016
 ESLapse: 23.11.2016
 FILapse: 23.11.2016
 FR 
 GBLapse: 23.02.2017
 GRLapse: 24.02.2017
 HRLapse: 23.11.2016
 HULapse: 23.01.2013
 IELapse: 23.01.2017
 IS 
 ITLapse: 23.11.2016
 LILapse: 31.01.2017
 LTLapse: 23.11.2016
 LULapse: 23.01.2017
LVLapse: 23.11.2016
 MCLapse: 23.11.2016
 MKLapse: 23.11.2016
 MTLapse: 23.01.2017
 NLLapse: 23.11.2016
 NOLapse: 23.02.2017
 PLLapse: 23.11.2016
 PTLapse: 23.03.2017
 ROLapse: 23.11.2016
 RSLapse: 23.11.2016
 SELapse: 23.11.2016
 SILapse: 23.11.2016
 SKLapse: 23.11.2016
 SMLapse: 23.11.2016
 TR 
Examination procedure11.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase23.07.2014National basic fee paid 
23.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted23.11.2016
Opposition procedure24.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit published on 01.11.2017 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:03.12.2014 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:03.12.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20140723
 
Event date:29.04.2015 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:14.10.2015 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20150917
 
Event date:29.06.2016 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20160601
 
Event date:23.11.2016 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:23.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:30.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:14.12.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:15.12.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 847711 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20161215
 
Event date:05.01.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602013014378 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
 
Event date:30.01.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:5
 
Event date:28.02.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161123
 
Event date:27.03.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT MG4D
Code Expl.:-INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT
 
Event date:29.03.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MP
Code Expl.:-PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)
Effective DATE:20161123
 
Event date:15.04.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK05 847711 AT T
Code Expl.:-REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT
Effective DATE:20161123
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170223
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161123
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161123
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170224
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161123
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170323
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161123
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170131
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161123
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161123
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161123
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161123
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161123
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161123
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161123
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161123
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161123
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161123
 
Event date:24.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602013014378 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161123
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20170223
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SM
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161123
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161123
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:29.09.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161123
 
Event date:25.10.2017 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20170223
 
Event date:31.10.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170131
 
Event date:31.10.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170131
 
Event date:01.11.2017 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20170824
 
Event date:01.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:30.11.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170123
 
Event date:30.11.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161123
 
Event date:30.01.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:6
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170123
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170223
 
Event date:28.09.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20170123
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20190130
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:28.06.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT; INVALID AB INITIO
Effective DATE:20130123
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20190329
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:31.10.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20161123