Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807119

EP2807119 - A METHOD OF REDUCING FRICTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amminex Emissions Technology A/S
Gladsaxevej 363
2860 Søborg / DK
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / QUAADE, Ulrich, J.
Gammelmosevej 331
DK-2880 Bagsværd / DK
02 / MØLLER BORREGAARD, Louise
Dag Hammarskjölds Allé 19
4 th.
DK-2100 København Ø / DK
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
[2016/47]
Former [2014/49]Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstraße 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date13713080.323.01.2013
[2016/47]
WO2013EP00203
Priority number, dateEP2012000039823.01.2012         Original published format: EP 12000398
US201261589442P23.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261589442 P
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013110457
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807119
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2807119
Date:23.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:C01C1/00, F01N3/20
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN[2015/39]
English:A METHOD OF REDUCING FRICTION[2014/49]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DE LA FRICTION[2014/49]
Former [2014/49]VERFAHREN ZUR REIBUNGSVERMINDERUNG
Entry into regional phase23.07.2014National basic fee paid 
23.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
09.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
01.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.2016Fee for grant paid
11.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.09.2015
Opposition(s)24.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.01.2013
AT23.11.2016
BE23.11.2016
CY23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
DK23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
IT23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
MC23.11.2016
MK23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
SI23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
SM23.11.2016
IE23.01.2017
LU23.01.2017
MT23.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG23.02.2017
GB23.02.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]HU23.01.2013
AT23.11.2016
BE23.11.2016
CY23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
DK23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
IT23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
MC23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
SI23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
SM23.11.2016
IE23.01.2017
LU23.01.2017
MT23.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG23.02.2017
GB23.02.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2019/31]HU23.01.2013
AT23.11.2016
BE23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
DK23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
IT23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
MC23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
SI23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
SM23.11.2016
IE23.01.2017
LU23.01.2017
MT23.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG23.02.2017
GB23.02.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2018/43]AT23.11.2016
BE23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
DK23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
IT23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
MC23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
SI23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
SM23.11.2016
IE23.01.2017
LU23.01.2017
MT23.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG23.02.2017
GB23.02.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2018/13]AT23.11.2016
BE23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
DK23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
IT23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
MC23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
SI23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
SM23.11.2016
IE23.01.2017
LU23.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG23.02.2017
GB23.02.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/51]AT23.11.2016
BE23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
DK23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
IT23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
MC23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
SI23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
SM23.11.2016
LU23.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
BG23.02.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/42]AT23.11.2016
BE23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
DK23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
IT23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
MC23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
SM23.11.2016
BG23.02.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/38]AT23.11.2016
BE23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
DK23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
IT23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
SM23.11.2016
BG23.02.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/37]AT23.11.2016
BE23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
DK23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
IT23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
SM23.11.2016
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/36]AT23.11.2016
BE23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
DK23.11.2016
EE23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RO23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
SK23.11.2016
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/34]AT23.11.2016
CZ23.11.2016
DK23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/33]AT23.11.2016
DK23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/26]AT23.11.2016
ES23.11.2016
FI23.11.2016
HR23.11.2016
LT23.11.2016
LV23.11.2016
NL23.11.2016
PL23.11.2016
RS23.11.2016
SE23.11.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO23.02.2017
GR24.02.2017
PT23.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV23.11.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]EP2305979  (AMMINEX AS [DK]) [A] 1-10 * figures 3,5; claim - *;
 [A]WO2010025948  (AMMINEX AS [DK]; QUAADE ULRICH [DK]; SVAGIN JAKOB [DK]; JOHANSEN JOHNN) [A] 1-3 * page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 29 *;
 [A]WO2006081824  (AMMINEX AS [DK]; JOHANNESSEN TUE [DK]; CHRISTENSEN CLAUS HVIID [DK]; N) [A] 1-8 * page 12, line 27 - page 13, line 30; claim - *;
 [AD]WO2011038916  (AMMINEX AS [DK]; SVAGIN JAKOB [DK]; QUAADE ULRICH J [DK]; JOHANSEN JOH) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [A]  - "Ceramics, Ceramic Processing", Ewsuk, K. G., Kirk-Othmer Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, John Wiley, (20001204), vol. 5, pages 638 - 669, XP002679651 [A] 1-8 * Chapter 4.3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/0471238961.0305180105231921.a01