Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2828036

EP2828036 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ELECTROMECHANICALLY-ASSISTED ROLLER BURNISHING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27 c
80686 München / DE
For all designated states
Technische Universität Berlin
Strasse des 17. Juni 135
10623 Berlin / DE
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / HÜNING, Holger
Pascalstraße 8-9
13189 Berlin / DE
02 / KÖNIG, Jens
Obere Hillegosser Str. 24
33699 Bielefeld / DE
03 / UHLMANN, Eckart
Erlenweg 12
25368 Kiebitzreihe / DE
04 / KÖNIG, Christoph
Willmanndamm 7
10287 Berlin / DE
 [2016/21]
Former [2015/05]01 / HÜNING, Holger
Pascalstraße 8-9
13189 Berlin / DE
02 / KÖNIG, Jens
Agricolastraße 19
10555 Berlin / DE
03 / UHLMANN, Eckart
Erlenweg 12
25368 Kiebitzreihe / DE
04 / KÖNIG, Christoph
Willmanndamm 7
10287 Berlin / DE
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12
10719 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/21]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimsthaler Straße 12
10719 Berlin / DE
Former [2015/05]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimstaler Strasse 12
10719 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date13713146.225.03.2013
[2016/21]
WO2013EP56316
Priority number, dateDE2012100647123.03.2012         Original published format: DE102012006471
[2015/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013139998
Date:26.09.2013
Language:DE
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2828036
Date:28.01.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2828036
Date:25.05.2016
Language:DE
[2016/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:B24B39/00, B24B49/14, B23P9/02, C21D9/00, C21D1/09
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ELEKTROMECHANISCH UNTERSTÜTZTEN GLATTWALZEN[2015/05]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ELECTROMECHANICALLY-ASSISTED ROLLER BURNISHING[2015/05]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉS AU GALETAGE À ASSISTANCE ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase17.10.2014National basic fee paid 
17.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
10.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.04.2016Fee for grant paid
07.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.12.2015
Opposition(s)28.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.03.2013
AL25.05.2016
BG25.05.2016
CY25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
MT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
[2019/47]
Former [2019/39]HU25.03.2013
AL25.05.2016
BG25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
MT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2019/31]HU25.03.2013
AL25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
MT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2018/46]AL25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
MT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2018/43]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
MT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2018/01]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/37]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/11]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]DE102004058146  (MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0026]; figure 1; claim 12 *;
 [A]DE102005041250  (UNIV KASSEL [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0010] , [0020]; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3142270  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 11, paragraph l; figures 3-6 *