Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2834897

EP2834897 - BACKUP POWER SYSTEM AND GROUNDING DEVICE FOR A BACKUP POWER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.04.2016
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMA Solar Technology AG
Sonnenallee 1
34266 Niestetal / DE
[2015/07]
Inventor(s)01 / ALLERT, Claus
Gerhart-Hauptmann-Straße 19A
34260 Kaufungen / DE
02 / HEINZE, Sebastian
Philosophenweg 21
34121 Kassel / DE
03 / MÜLLER, Jens-Uwe
Obervellmarsche Straße 34
34246 Vellmar / DE
 [2015/07]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/07]Kleine, Hubertus
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date13713435.928.03.2013
WO2013EP56773
Priority number, dateDE20121010276630.03.2012         Original published format: DE102012102766
[2015/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013144316
Date:03.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2834897
Date:11.02.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013
[2015/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:H02H11/00
[2015/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/07]
TitleGerman:RESERVESTROMSYSTEM UND ERDUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN RESERVESTROMSYSTEM[2015/07]
English:BACKUP POWER SYSTEM AND GROUNDING DEVICE FOR A BACKUP POWER SYSTEM[2015/07]
French:SYSTÈME D' ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE DE SECOURS ET DISPOSITIF DE MISE À LA TERRE POUR UN SYSTÈME D' ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE DE SECOURS[2015/07]
Entry into regional phase30.10.2014National basic fee paid 
30.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/07]
19.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.12.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[ID]DE202010008123U  (SMA SOLAR TECHNOLOGY AG [DE]) [ID] 1-12 * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US6091591  (HEINZ KLAUS DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 11; figure 1 *
by applicantEP1965483
 DE102010000502
 DE202010008123U
 EP0435686