Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2828530

EP2828530 - A DETERMINATION METHOD AND A CONTROL METHOD FOR A FLUID DISPLACEMENT DEVICE, CONTROLLER AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.12.2014
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Comoco B.V.
Ambachtsweg 8
5492 NJ Sint-Oedenrode / NL
[2015/25]
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Comoco B.V.
Ambachtsweg 8
5492 NJ Sint-Oedenrode / NL
For all designated states
Piak Electronic Design BV
Markt 49
4101 BW Culemborg / NL
Inventor(s)01 / VELTMAN, André
Markt 49
4101 BW Culemborg / NL
02 / BEEKMANS, Robert
Ambachtsweg 8
5492 NJ Sint-Oedenrode / NL
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Nollen, Maarten Dirk-Johan
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[2015/05]
Application number, filing date13713567.915.03.2013
WO2013NL50193
Priority number, dateNL2012200850419.03.2012         Original published format: NL 2008504
NL2012200877408.05.2012         Original published format: NL 2008774
US201261653380P30.05.2012         Original published format: US 201261653380 P
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013141698
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2828530
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:F04D15/00
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
TitleGerman:BESTIMMUNGSVERFAHREN UND STEUERVERFAHREN FÜR EINE FLÜSSIGKEITSVERDRÄNGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, STEUERUNG UND SYSTEM[2015/05]
English:A DETERMINATION METHOD AND A CONTROL METHOD FOR A FLUID DISPLACEMENT DEVICE, CONTROLLER AND SYSTEM[2015/05]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE DÉPLACEMENT DE FLUIDE, UNITÉ DE COMMANDE ET SYSTÈME[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase02.09.2014National basic fee paid 
02.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201503   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.2015
31.03.201806   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]US2005031443  (OHLSSON BERTIL [SE] ET AL) [X] 1-37 * the whole document * * claim 1 * * figure 7 *;
 [X]US2010143157  (AHONEN TERO [FI] ET AL) [X] 1-37 * the whole document * * figure 2 *
by applicantUS2008124226
 US6504338
 US5231339