blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2828530 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2828530



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 215
26.08.2019 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
04.05.2018 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
29.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.06.2015 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
25.06.2015 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
13.05.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
07.05.2015 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
02.04.2015 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
02.04.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
02.04.2015 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
30.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.03.2015 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 3
08.01.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
28.10.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
24.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.10.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 5
07.10.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
08.09.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.09.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
02.09.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
02.09.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
27.08.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
30.07.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
15.10.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 36
15.10.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
15.10.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37
26.09.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
26.09.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 27
30.07.2013 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
24.07.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
24.07.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
24.07.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
15.03.2013 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
15.03.2013 Claims International Searching Authority 6
15.03.2013 Description International Searching Authority 16
15.03.2013 Drawings International Searching Authority 4