blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2828530


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.05.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
02.05.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
02.05.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.08.2015 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
28.08.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.05.2015 Change - extension states published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
15.05.2015 Change - applicant published on  17.06.2015  [2015/25]
08.05.2015 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
26.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
26.12.2014 Request for examination filed published on  28.01.2015  [2015/05]
16.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
25.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
05.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
04.09.2014 Amendment by applicant
08.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
27.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
12.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication