blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2828530
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2015037169Global Dossier 05.02.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013NL50193 15.03.2013
US201314379469 15.03.2013
NL2008504 19.03.2012
US201261653380 30.05.2012
NL2008774 08.05.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2828530Global Dossier 28.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013NL50193 15.03.2013
NL2008504 19.03.2012
US201261653380 30.05.2012
NL2008774 08.05.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NL2008774C 23.09.2013C2
Priority number Date
NL2008504 19.03.2012
NL2008774 08.05.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013141698Global Dossier 26.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
NL2008504 19.03.2012
US201261653380 30.05.2012
NL2008774 08.05.2012