Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2834657

EP2834657 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SIGNALING PARTIAL SHADOWING OF A PHOTOVOLTAIC GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.02.2019  [2019/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMA Solar Technology AG
Sonnenallee 1
34266 Niestetal / DE
[2015/07]
Inventor(s)01 / MERZ, Christopher
Sophienstraße 26
34117 Kassel / DE
02 / BIENIEK, Sebastian
Bahnhofstr. 21
35066 Frankenberg / DE
03 / HOPF, Markus
Gangloffsömmerner Ring 18
34314 Espenau / DE
04 / EGER, Felix
Pfeifferstr. 13
34131 Kassel / DE
 [2015/07]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/07]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date13713860.828.03.2013
WO2013EP56787
Priority number, dateDE20121010293204.04.2012         Original published format: DE102012102932
[2015/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013149960
Date:10.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2834657
Date:11.02.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2013
[2015/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/40, H01L31/042, H01L31/02, G01R31/26, H02S50/10
[2018/16]
Former International [2015/07]G01R31/40, H01L31/042
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/07]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SIGNALISIERUNG EINER TEILWEISEN VERSCHATTUNG EINES FOTOVOLTAIKGENERATORS[2015/07]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SIGNALING PARTIAL SHADOWING OF A PHOTOVOLTAIC GENERATOR[2015/07]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR SIGNALER L'OMBRAGE PARTIEL D'UN GÉNÉRATEUR PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE[2015/07]
Entry into regional phase03.11.2014National basic fee paid 
03.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/07]
10.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/06]
19.09.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2019/06]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.04.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[IY]FR2943852  (PHOTOWATT INTERNAT [FR]) [I] 1-5,10-15 * page 5, paragraph 5 - page 7, paragraph 9; claim 1 * [Y] 6-9;
 [YA]DE9312710U  (INST SOLARE ENERGIEVERSORGUNGS [DE]) [Y] 6-9 * the whole document * [A] 1-5,10-15;
 [A]EP2388602  (SMA SOLAR TECHNOLOGY AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0049]; figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0026] *;
 [XA]WO9533283  (REAL MARKUS [CH]) [X] 1-5,10-15 * page 3, paragraph 4; claims 2, 4 * [A] 6-9;
 [A]US2012049879  (CRITES DAVID E [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]EP2388603  (SMA SOLAR TECHNOLOGY AG [DE]; UNIV KASSEL [DE]) [A] 4 * figure 1a *;
 [A]DE102009029934  (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] *;
 [A]WO2012000533  (SMA SOLAR TECHNOLOGY AG [DE]; HOPF MARKUS [DE]; BEHRENDS HOLGER [DE];) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
by applicantDE102006052295
 EP2388602
 WO2012000533
 DE102009029934