Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815045

EP2815045 - KEY AND DISC TUMBLER CYLINDER LOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.05.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Abloy Oy
Wahlforssinkatu 20
80100 Joensuu / FI
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / ULJENS, Peder
Juoksijankatu 6 B 5
FI-20360 Turku / FI
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Berggren Oy, Helsinki & Oulu
P.O. Box 16
Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A
00101 Helsinki / FI
[2017/28]
Former [2014/52]Berggren Oy Ab
P.O. Box 16
Antinkatu 3 C
00101 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date13713932.514.02.2013
[2017/28]
WO2013FI50174
Priority number, dateFI2012000005016.02.2012         Original published format: FI 20120050
FI2012000005116.02.2012         Original published format: FI 20120051
FI2012000005316.02.2012         Original published format: FI 20120053
[2014/52]
Filing languageFI
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013121114
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815045
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2815045
Date:12.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:E05B29/00
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBA01.08.2014
TitleGerman:SCHLÜSSEL UND PLÄTTCHENZYLINDERSCHLOSS[2014/52]
English:KEY AND DISC TUMBLER CYLINDER LOCK[2014/52]
French:CLÉ ET SERRURE À CYLINDRE À PAILLETTES[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase01.08.2014National basic fee paid 
01.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
18.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.05.2017Fee for grant paid
31.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP15159565.9  / EP2902569
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.03.2017
Opposition(s)13.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI12.07.2017
MC12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
IS12.11.2017
LU14.02.2018
[2018/52]
Former [2018/44]FI12.07.2017
MC12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/27]FI12.07.2017
SM12.07.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/11]FI12.07.2017
IS12.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI12.07.2017
Cited inInternational search[A]GB157882  (JOSEPH ABBE) [A] 1 * page 2, lines 65-72; figure 11 *;
 [AD]US6758074  (PRUNBAUER KURT [AT]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE395252  (HANS SPRUTH DIPL ING) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB1503586  (WAERTSILAE OY AB [FI]) [A] 12 * figure . *;
 [A]WO2008034345  (LI SHANDE [CN]) [A] 12,19 * figure - *;
 [A]WO9208862  (HAAVIKKO PAAVO [FI]) [A] 12-15,19 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0488619  (ABLOY SECURITY LTD OY [FI]) [A] 12-15,19 * column 5, lines 11-21; figure - *
by applicantSE329104
 US6758074