Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2825663

EP2825663 - SEPARATOME-BASED PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.10.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Board of Trustees of the University of Arkansas
2404 North University Avenue
Little Rock, AR 72207-3608 / US
For all designated states
University of Pittsburgh - Of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education
200 Gardner Steel Conference Center
Thackeray & O'Hara Streets
Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US
[2019/32]
Former [2015/04]For all designated states
Board of Trustees of the University of Arkansas
2404 North University Avenue
Little Rock, AR 72207-3608 / US
For all designated states
University of Pittsburgh - Of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education
200 Gardner Steel Conference Center
Thackeray & O'Hara Streets
Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BRUNE, Ellen, M.
2404 North University
Little Rock, AR 72207-3608 / US
02 / BEITLE, Robert, R., Jr.
2404 North University
Little Rock, AR 72207-3608 / US
03 / ATAAI, Mohammad, M
200 Gardner Steel Conference Center
Thackeray & O'Hara Streets
Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US
04 / BARTLOW, Patrick, R.
200 Gardner Steel Conference Center
Thackeray & O'Hara Streets
Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US
05 / HENRY, Ralph L.
2404 North University
Little Rock, AR 72207-3608 / US
 [2018/01]
Former [2015/04]01 / BRUNE, Ellen, M.
2404 North University
Little Rock, AR 72207-3608 / US
02 / BEITLE, Robert, R.
2404 North University
Little Rock, AR 72207-3608 / US
03 / ATAAI, Mohammad, M
200 Gardner Steel Conference Center
Thackeray & O'Hara Streets
Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US
04 / BARTLOW, Patrick, R.
200 Gardner Steel Conference Center
Thackeray & O'Hara Streets
Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US
05 / HENRY, Ralph L.
2404 North University
Little Rock, AR 72207-3608 / US
Representative(s)Callaghan, Dayle Anne
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2019/32]
Former [2015/04]Briscoe, Paul Brian
Rouse IP Limited
11th Floor, Exchange Tower
1 Harbour Exchange Square
London E14 9GE / GB
Application number, filing date13714069.512.03.2013
[2019/32]
WO2013US30549
Priority number, dateUS201261610298P13.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261610298 P
[2015/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013138351
Date:19.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2825663
Date:21.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2013
[2015/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2825663
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:C12P21/02, C12N1/20, C12N15/70, C12N15/74, C12N15/79
[2015/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/04]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUF SEPARATOM BASIERTE PROTEINEXPRESSIONS- UND -REINIGUNGSPLATTFORM[2015/04]
English:SEPARATOME-BASED PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION PLATFORM[2015/04]
French:PLATEFORME D'EXPRESSION ET DE PURIFICATION DE PROTÉINES À BASE DE SÉPARATOME[2015/04]
Entry into regional phase03.10.2014National basic fee paid 
03.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/04]
27.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.10.2017
11.10.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
30.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
02.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
05.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
07.06.2019Fee for grant paid
07.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.01.2016
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
07.06.2019Request for further processing filed
07.06.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.06.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]  - LIU Z ET AL, "Use of proteomics for design of a tailored host cell for highly efficient protein purification", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, NL, vol. 1216, no. 12, doi:10.1016/J.CHROMA.2009.01.020, ISSN 0021-9673, (20090320), pages 2433 - 2438, (20090115), XP025990482 [X] 1-6,8-13,15-18,23,24,30,31,83 * page 2434; table 1 * [I] 7,14,19-22,25-29,67-91

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chroma.2009.01.020
 [X]  - T. M. CONRAD ET AL, "RNA polymerase mutants found through adaptive evolution reprogram Escherichia coli for optimal growth in minimal media", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20101123), vol. 107, no. 47, doi:10.1073/pnas.0911253107, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 20500 - 20505, XP055073428 [X] 1-6,8,12,13,15-18,23,24,32-54 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0911253107
 [X]  - SONG C ET AL, "Bioinformatic Comparison of Bacterial Secretomes", GENOMICS PROTEOMICS AND BIOINFORMATICS, BEIJING GENOMICS INSTITUTE, BEIJING, CN, vol. 7, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/S1672-0229(08)60031-5, ISSN 1672-0229, (20090601), pages 37 - 46, (20090601), XP026285450 [X] 55-66 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1672-0229(08)60031-5
ExaminationJP2007306910
by applicantUS8178339
 US8119365
 US8043842
 US8039243
 US7303906
 US6989265
 US2012219994
 EP1483367
 US2009075352
 US2012183995
    - YU ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 20, pages 1018 - 1023
    - ASENJO ET AL., "Is there a rational method to purify proteins? From expert systems to proteomics", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR RECOGNITION, (2004), vol. 17, pages 236 - 247
    - CAI ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (2004), vol. 88, page 77
    - TIWARI ET AL., PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, (2010), vol. 70, pages 191 - 195
    - LIU ET AL., J. CHRON2ATOG. A, (2009), vol. 1216, pages 2433 - 2438
    - BARTLOW ET AL., PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, (2011), vol. 78, pages 216 - 224
    - BARTLOW ET AL., AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF CHEMICAL ENGINEERS BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (2012), vol. 28, pages 137 - 145
    - CAPARON ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. BIOERCG., (2010), vol. 105, no. 2, pages 239 - 249
    - "Guide to Protein Purification", BURGESS; DEUTSCHER, Methods in Enzymology, Second Edition, ACADEMIC PRESS, (2009), vol. 463
    - BABA ET AL., MOL. SYST. BIOL., (2006), vol. 2
    - DATSENKO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U S A., (2000), vol. 97, no. 12, pages 6640 - 5
    - STRINGER ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2012), vol. 7, no. 9, page E44841
    - NATURE, (2009), vol. 457, no. 7228, pages 395 - 433
    - MOLECULAR CANCER THERAPEUTICS, (2002), vol. 1, pages 347 - 355
    - YIN ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2007), vol. 127, no. 3, pages 335 - 347
    - BANEYX, CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (1999), vol. 10, no. 5, pages 411 - 21
    - "Production of commercially valuable products", ZUKOWSKI, Biology of Bacilli: Applications to Industry, BUTTERWORTH-HEINEMANN, (1992), pages 311 - 337
    - DATE ET AL., LETTAPPL MICROBIOL., (2006), vol. 42, no. 1, pages 66 - 70
    - RETALLACK, PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, (2011), vol. 81, pages 157 - 65
    - CREGG ET AL., MOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2000), vol. 16, no. 1, pages 23 - 52
    - MALYS ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (2011), vol. 500, pages 197 - 212
    - HELLWIG ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2004), vol. 22, no. 11, pages 1415 - 1422
    - HEMPEL ET AL., "Algae as Protein Factories: Expression of a Human Antibody and the Respective Antigen in the Diatom Phaeodactylum tricornutum", PLOS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, no. 12, page E28424
    - YIN ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2007), vol. 127, pages 335 - 347
    - DYRING, BIOPROCESSING JOURNAL, (2011), vol. 10, pages 28 - 35
    - OLCZAK; OLCZAK, ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 359, pages 45 - 53
    - MCCARROLL; KING, CURRENT OPINIONS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 8, pages 590 - 594
    - KOST ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2005), vol. 23, no. 5, pages 567 - 75
    - ROSSER ET AL., PROTEIN EXPR. PURIF., (2005), vol. 40, no. 2, pages 237 - 43
    - LACKNER ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (2008), vol. 380, no. 1, pages 146 - 8
    - F.M. WURM, NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2004), vol. 22, no. 11, pages 1393 - 1398
    - LIU ET AL., J. CHROMATOG., (2009), vol. A 1216, pages 2433 - 2438
    - HASHIMOTO ET AL., MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, (2005), vol. 55, pages 137 - 149
    - JENSEN ET AL., JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 175, no. 11, pages 3401 - 7
    - DATSENKO ET AL., PNAS, (2000), vol. 97, no. 12, pages 6640 - 5
    - KORZ ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 39, no. 1, pages 59 - 65
    - LEE ET AL., TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, no. 3, pages 98 - 105
    - SHILOACH ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY ADVANCES, (2005), vol. 23, no. 5, pages 345 - 57
    - RAPPSILBER ET AL., Analytical Chemistry, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2003), vol. 75, pages 663 - 70
    - KESSNER ET AL., BIOINFORMATICS, (2008), vol. 24, no. 21, pages 2534 - 6
    - "The UniProt Consortium", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2012), vol. 40, pages D71 - 5
    - CRAIG ET AL., BIOINFORMATICS, (2004), vol. 20, no. 9, pages 1466 - 7
    - MACLEAN ET AL., BIOINFORMATICS, (2006), vol. 22, no. 22, pages 2830 - 2
    - GEER ET AL., JOURNAL OF PROTEOME RESEARCH, vol. 3, no. 5, pages 958 - 64
    - LIU ET AL., ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 76, no. 14, pages 4193 - 201
    - BLATTNER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 277, no. 5331, pages 1453 - 62
    - GERDES ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (2003), vol. 185, no. 19, pages 5673 - 84
    - HASHIMOTO ET AL., MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, (2005), vol. 55, no. 1, pages 137 - 49
    - KATO; HASHIMOTO, MOLECULAR SYSTEMS BIOLOGY, (2007), vol. 3, no. 132, page 132
    - KANG Y ET AL., J. BACTERIOL, (2004), vol. 186, no. 15, pages 4921 - 30
    - STRINGER ET AL., PLOS ONE., (2012), vol. 7, no. 9, page E44841