Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2858837

EP2858837 - ASSEMBLY OF A BALL JOINT AND A TRIANGULAR SUSPENSION ARM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.12.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU, SM
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
05.12.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Federal-Mogul Products US LLC
27300 West Eleven Mile Road
Southfield, MI 48034 / US
[2019/01]
Former [2018/41]For all designated states
Federal-Mogul Products, Inc.
27300 West Eleven Mile Road
Southfield, MI 48034 / US
Former [2015/16]For all designated states
Federal-Mogul Products, Inc.
26555 Northwestern Highway
Southfield, MI 48033 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BYRNES, Thomas, J.
2729 Sunny Meadows Dr.
St. Charles, MO 63303 / US
 [2015/16]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
4th Floor
Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
[2019/04]
Former [2015/16]Barker, Rosemary Anne
HGF Limited
4th Floor, Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
Application number, filing date13714116.415.03.2013
[2019/04]
WO2013US31827
Priority number, dateUS201261656094P06.06.2012         Original published format: US 201261656094 P
[2015/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013184221
Date:12.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2858837
Date:15.04.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2013
[2015/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2858837
Date:23.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60G7/00, B60G7/02, F16C11/06
[2015/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMBINATION VON EINEM KUGELGELENK UND EINEM DREIECKSLENKER[2018/44]
English:ASSEMBLY OF A BALL JOINT AND A TRIANGULAR SUSPENSION ARM[2015/16]
French:ENSEMBLE D'UNE ROTULE ET D'UN TRIANGLE DE SUSPENSION[2018/44]
Former [2015/16]ANORDNUNG AUS EINEM KUGELGELENK UND EINEM DREIECKSLENKER
Former [2015/16]ENSEMBLE JOINT À BILLE ET BRAS DE SUSPENSION TRIANGULAIRE
Entry into regional phase08.12.2014National basic fee paid 
08.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/16]
16.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.12.2018Fee for grant paid
05.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.01.2018
Opposition(s)24.10.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
07.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL23.01.2019
CZ23.01.2019
DK23.01.2019
EE23.01.2019
ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
MC23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RO23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
SK23.01.2019
SM23.01.2019
LU15.03.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
[2019/52]
Former [2019/49]AL23.01.2019
CZ23.01.2019
DK23.01.2019
EE23.01.2019
ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
MC23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RO23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
SK23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/48]DK23.01.2019
ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
MC23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/46]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
MC23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/39]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/38]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/37]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/30]NL23.01.2019
Cited inInternational search[I]US5230580  (HENKEL GUENTHER [DE]) [I] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [X]US3317256  (ERNEST RICHARD B) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [IA]US4718780  (TRUDEAU WILLIAM H [US]) [I] 1,2,4-10 * the whole document * [A] 3