blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2858837 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2858837



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 235
04.02.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
05.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.12.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
05.12.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
05.12.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
30.11.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
02.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.11.2018 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
29.10.2018 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
19.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.10.2018 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 2
19.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.10.2018 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
11.10.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
11.10.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
11.10.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
11.10.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
11.10.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 24
10.09.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
05.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.09.2018 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
23.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.05.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
23.05.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
23.05.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
23.05.2018 Description Search / examination 3
23.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
23.05.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.01.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
22.01.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.01.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
02.03.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
22.02.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
25.02.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
18.02.2016 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 8
04.01.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
16.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.07.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
16.07.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
16.07.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
16.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.04.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.04.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
18.03.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.01.2015 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
09.01.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.12.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
08.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.12.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
17.10.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
02.01.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 23
12.12.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
12.12.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 25
19.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
19.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
19.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
16.04.2013 Notification relating to priority claim International Searching Authority 2
29.03.2013 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
29.03.2013 Claims International Searching Authority 3
29.03.2013 Description International Searching Authority 10
29.03.2013 Drawings International Searching Authority 11