blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2858837


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.11.2019 [2019/46]
23.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
16.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
26.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
12.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
21.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
21.12.2018 (Expected) grant published on  23.01.2019  [2019/04]
12.12.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
07.12.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
07.12.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
30.11.2018 Change - applicant published on  02.01.2019  [2019/01]
10.10.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.09.2018 Change - German title published on  31.10.2018  [2018/44]
28.09.2018 Change - French title published on  31.10.2018  [2018/44]
07.09.2018 Change - applicant published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
29.05.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
13.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.01.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
19.01.2018 First examination report
10.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.02.2017 Change - representative
11.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.02.2016 Change - representative
07.08.2015 Change - extension states published on  09.09.2015  [2015/37]
24.07.2015 Amendment by applicant
13.03.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
13.03.2015 Request for examination filed published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
17.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.01.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
16.12.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.12.2014 Change - representative
10.12.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
06.01.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
13.12.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
14.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
12.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication