blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2858837 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380041471 EP13714116



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8925944Global Dossier 06.01.2015B2
US2013328284 12.12.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201313804571 14.03.2013
US201261656094 06.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20150027784Global Dossier 12.03.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013US31827 15.03.2013
US201261656094 06.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2015526325Global Dossier 10.09.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013US31827 15.03.2013
US201261656094 06.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104540693BGlobal Dossier 06.03.2018B
CN104540693 22.04.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013US31827 15.03.2013
US201261656094 06.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2858837Global Dossier 23.01.2019B1
EP2858837 15.04.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013US31827 15.03.2013
US201261656094 06.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2875744 12.12.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2013US31827 15.03.2013
US201261656094 06.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX353473 15.01.2018B
MX2014014905 29.09.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013US31827 15.03.2013
US201261656094 06.06.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013184221Global Dossier 12.12.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261656094 06.06.2012