EP2833767 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING METERED AMOUNTS OF INGREDIENT, ESPECIALLY FOR A TAILORED NUTRITION TO INFANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2024 | Deletion: Date of oral proceedings | 20.04.2024 | Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH | [2019/28] |
Former [2017/42] | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2015/07] | For all designated states Nestec S.A. CT-IAM Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMEYE, Laurent 51 Chemin de Richesson 1000 Lausanne / CH | 02 /
HAMAOKA-HERMANN, Marilisa Avenue du Major-Davel 22B 1800 Vevey / CH | 03 /
STAN, Simona Rte des Planchettes 1 1847 Rennaz / CH | 04 /
STEENHOUT, Philippe Route de Blonay 156 1814 La Tour-de-Peilz / CH | 05 /
TAN, Sze Chemin de Panessière 8B 1803 Chardonne / CH | [2018/08] |
Former [2015/07] | 01 /
AMEYE, Laurent 51 Chemin de Richesson CH-1000 Lausanne / CH | ||
02 /
HAMAOKA-HERMANN, Marilisa Avenue du Major-Davel 22B CH-1800 Vevey / CH | |||
03 /
STAN, Simona Rte des Planchettes 1 CH-1847 Rennaz / CH | |||
04 /
STEENHOUT, Philippe Route de Blonay 156 CH-1814 La TOUR-DE-PEILZ / CH | |||
05 /
TAN, Sze Chemin de Panessière 8B CH-1803 Chardonne / CH | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2018/08] | Gagliardi, Tatiana Nestec S.A. Centre de Recherche Nestlé Vers-chez-les-Blanc Case Postale 44 1000 Lausanne 26 / CH | ||
Former [2015/07] | Fraisse, Sandrine Nestec S.A. CT-IAM Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 13714278.2 | 03.04.2013 | [2018/08] | WO2013EP57020 | Priority number, date | EP20120163411 | 05.04.2012 Original published format: EP 12163411 | [2015/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013150070 | Date: | 10.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2833767 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2833767 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/40 | [2015/07] | CPC: |
A47J31/404 (EP,US);
A47J31/402 (RU,US);
A47J31/40 (US);
A23L2/52 (US);
A23L33/115 (US);
A23L33/135 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON ABGEMESSENEN MENGEN EINES INHALTSTOFFES, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE ANGEPASSTE SÄUGLINGSERNÄHRUNG | [2015/07] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING METERED AMOUNTS OF INGREDIENT, ESPECIALLY FOR A TAILORED NUTRITION TO INFANTS | [2015/07] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FOURNIR DES QUANTITÉS DOSÉES D'INGRÉDIENT, EN PARTICULIER POUR UNE NUTRITION SUR MESURE DES NOURRISSONS | [2015/07] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/07] | 07.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 17.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.11.2018
ADMISSIBLE N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL Opponent's representative Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2018/52] | 05.12.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.04.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.04.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.04.2020 | 21.04.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.05.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.11.2020 | 13.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.01.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.02.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 19.11.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 06.04.2021 | Appeal received No. T0315/21 | 06.04.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 07.06.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.03.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 06.04.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Request for further processing for: | 17.08.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 17.08.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.08.2015 | Decision despatched | 17.08.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 17.08.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.08.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.04.2013 | AL | 21.02.2018 | AT | 21.02.2018 | CY | 21.02.2018 | CZ | 21.02.2018 | DK | 21.02.2018 | EE | 21.02.2018 | FI | 21.02.2018 | HR | 21.02.2018 | IT | 21.02.2018 | LT | 21.02.2018 | LV | 21.02.2018 | MC | 21.02.2018 | MK | 21.02.2018 | PL | 21.02.2018 | PT | 21.02.2018 | RO | 21.02.2018 | RS | 21.02.2018 | SE | 21.02.2018 | SI | 21.02.2018 | SK | 21.02.2018 | SM | 21.02.2018 | TR | 21.02.2018 | IE | 03.04.2018 | LU | 03.04.2018 | MT | 03.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | BG | 21.05.2018 | NO | 21.05.2018 | GR | 22.05.2018 | IS | 21.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 03.04.2013 | |
AL | 21.02.2018 | ||
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
MK | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PT | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IE | 03.04.2018 | ||
LU | 03.04.2018 | ||
MT | 03.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 03.04.2013 | |
AL | 21.02.2018 | ||
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PT | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IE | 03.04.2018 | ||
LU | 03.04.2018 | ||
MT | 03.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IE | 03.04.2018 | ||
LU | 03.04.2018 | ||
MT | 03.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
IE | 03.04.2018 | ||
LU | 03.04.2018 | ||
MT | 03.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
IE | 03.04.2018 | ||
LU | 03.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
LU | 03.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
LU | 03.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006278093 (BIDERMAN EYTAN [IL], et al) [X] 1-22* paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0021] , [0033] , [0036] - [0038] - [0057] , [0062] , [0077] , [0078]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]US2011052764 (BULGIN TOM [GB]) [X] 1-22 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] - [0014] - [0027] , [0033] - [0036] - [0075]; figure -; claim - * | by applicant | US2006278093 | WO2008111942 | US2011052764 | - C. AGOSTONI ET AL., "Enteral Nutrient Supply for Preterm Infants: Commentary From the European Society for Paediatric Gastroenterology, Hepatology, and Nutrition Committee on Nutrition", JPGN, (201001), vol. 50, no. 1 | Opposition | WO2006026879 | US2006278093 | US7762181 | WO2011046647 | - "Report of the Scientific Committee on Food on the Revision of Essential Requirements of Infant Formulae and Follow-on Formulae", European Commission ; Scientific Committee on Food, (20030404), pages 1 - 211, XP055532225 |