Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2828339

EP2828339 - CARBOXYLATE DYES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Milliken & Company
920 Milliken Road, M-495
Spartanburg, South Carolina 29303 / US
[2018/42]
Former [2018/25]For all designated states
Milliken & Company
920 Milliken Road, M-495
Spartanburg, South Carolina 29303 / US
For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Milliken & Company
920 Milliken Road, M-149
Spartanburg, South Carolina 29303 / US
For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MIRACLE, Gregory S.
7063 Francis Drive
Liberty Township, Ohio 45044 / US
02 / TORRES, Eduardo
145 Lewis Burnett Drive
Boiling Springs, South Carolina 29316 / US
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2015/05]
Application number, filing date13714456.419.03.2013
[2018/44]
WO2013US32967
Priority number, dateUS201261612539P19.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261612539 P
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013142495
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2828339
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2828339
Date:31.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:C09B29/01, C09B29/08, C11D3/40, C11D3/42
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:CARBOXYLATFARBSTOFFE[2015/05]
English:CARBOXYLATE DYES[2015/05]
French:COLORANTS CARBOXILATE[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase17.09.2014National basic fee paid 
17.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
13.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.09.2018Fee for grant paid
18.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.02.2017
Opposition(s)01.08.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
MC31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
[2019/46]
Former [2019/40]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/37]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/35]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/34]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/25]AT31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
NO31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT31.10.2018
NO31.01.2019
Cited inInternational search[X]EP2085434  (UNIV FIRENZE [IT], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 2, paragraph 0001 * * page 6; compounds 1-LS *;
 [X]GB1428395  (ICI LTD) [X] 1,2 * page 4; compound 7 *;
 [X]WO0119804  (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 1, paragraph 0001 * * compound 2 *;
 [X]WO2010141731  (AAT BIOQUEST INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 1, paragraph 0001 * * page 46; compound 12 *;
 [X]GB1464947  (MONTEDISON SPA) [X] 1,2 * page 1, lines 1-2 * * page 2; example 1 *;
 [XY]WO2007084729  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 1 * * page 23; compound 18 * * page 1, paragraph last * [Y] 3;
 [Y]WO2008090042  (DYSTAR TEXTILFARBEN GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [Y] 3 * page 1, lines 15-16 * * page 1, lines 13-16 *;
 [XP]WO2012166699  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [XP] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [XP]WO2012166584  (MILLIKEN & CO [US], et al) [XP] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [XP]WO2013006871  (MILLIKEN & CO [US], et al) [XP] 1,2 * the whole document *
by applicantEP2085434
 US3793305
 GB1428395
 WO2011017719
 US3943120
 US5135972
 US5576282
 US6306812
 US6326348
 WO2008087497
 US7208459
 WO2012054835
 WO2009069077
 WO2012166768
 US2008305982
 US2009247449
 WO9108281
 WO9001815
 US6312936
 US5679630
 US4760025
 US7262042
 WO2009021867
 WO8906270
 WO2005052161
 WO2005052146
 WO2007044993
 US5352604
 US7153818
 WO9700324
 EP1022334
 WO9402597
 WO9418314
 WO9623874
 WO9743424
 US5856164
 WO9923211
 WO9623873
 WO0060060
 WO2006002643
 US6093562
 WO2009149130
 US6939702
 US2009217464
 US7141403
 WO9817767
 WO2012000846
 WO2008015443
 WO2008014965
 US2007173430
 US4430243
 US5597936
 US5595967
 WO2005042532
 WO0032601
 US6225464
 US7445644
 US7585376
 US2009176684
 WO2012004134
 US4790856
 US3646015
 BE680847
 US2006205631
 US2005203213
 US7294611
 US6855680
 WO2010034736
 US3962418
 US3958581
 US2007207109
 USRE34584E
 US5104646
 US5106609
 US4152416
 US2826551
 US3964500
 US4364837
 US6607717
 US6482969
 US5807956
 US5981681
 US6207782
 US7465439
 US7041767
 US7217777
 US2007286837
 US2005048549
 US2007041929
 GB849433
 DE10036533
 US5674478
 US5750122
 US4529586
 US4507280
 US4663158
 US4197865
 US4217914
 US4381919
 US4422853
 WO2009043709
 US4489455
 US4489574
 US2954347
 US4265779
 US3455839
 US3933672
 US4652392
 US4978471
 US4983316
 US5288431
 US4639489
 US4749740
 US4798679
 US4075118
 EP0150872
 DE2124526
 WO2011163457
 US4990280
 US2003087791
 US2003087790
 US2005003983
 US2004048764
 US4762636
 US6291412
 US2005227891
 EP1070115
 US5879584
 US5691297
 US5574005
 US5569645
 US5565422
 US5516448
 US5489392
 US5486303
 EP2133410
 US6166117
 US6787512
 WO2010084039
 WO2007039042
 WO2010022775
 WO2009132870
 WO2009087033
 WO2007006357
 WO2007096052
 WO2011020991
 WO2006053598
 WO03018740
 WO03018738
 US6020303
 US6060443
    - JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY OF DYERS AND COLOURISTS, (1984), vol. 100, no. 10, pages 316 - 19
    - DYES AND PIGMENTS, (1994), vol. 24, no. 3, page 207
    - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Engineering, 2d ed.,, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., (1989), vol. 15, pages 204 - 308
    - Kirk Othmer Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, Third Edition,, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., (1979), vol. 7, pages 430 - 447
 EP19890307851
 EP20080101442