Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2812326

EP2812326 - ANTIVIRAL COMPOUNDS WITH A DIBENZOOXAHETEROCYCLE MOIETY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.09.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 18.10.2017  [2017/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lupin Limited
Kalpataru Inspire
3rd Floor
Off Western Express Highway
Santacruz (East)
Mumbai 400 055 / IN
[2017/08]
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
Lupin Limited
159 CST Road
Kalina
Santacruz (East)
State of Maharashtra, Mumbai 400 098 / IN
Inventor(s)01 / RAMDAS, Vidya
Lupin Limited (Research Park)
46A
47A Nande Village
Taluka
Mulshi, India. / Pune 412 115 / IN
02 / JOSHI, Advait, Arun
Lupin Limited (Research Park)
46A
47A Nande Village
Taluka
Mulshi, India. / Pune 412 115 / IN
03 / BANERJEE, Moloy, Manoj
Lupin Limited (Research Park)
46A
47A Nande Village
Taluka
Mulshi, India. / Pune 412 115 / IN
04 / DAS, Amit, Kumar
Lupin Limited (Research Park)
46A
47A Nande Village
Taluka
Mulshi, India. / Pune 412 115 / IN
05 / WALKE, Deepak, Sahebrao
Lupin Limited (Research Park)
46A
47A Nande Village
Taluka
Mulshi, India. / Pune 412 115 / IN
06 / PALLE, Venkata, P.
Lupin Limited (Research Park)
46A
47A Nande Village
Taluka
Mulshi, India. / Pune 412 115 / IN
07 / KAMBOJ, Rajender, Kumar
Lupin Limited (Research Park)
46A
47A Nande Village
Taluka
Mulshi, India. / Pune 412 115 / IN
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Wichmann, Hendrik
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Wichmann, Hendrik
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date13715002.508.02.2013
WO2013IB51062
Priority number, dateIN2012KOL14710.02.2012         Original published format: IN 147KO2012
IN2012KOL101704.09.2012         Original published format: IN 1017KO2012
[2017/16]
Former [2014/51]IN2012KOL014710.02.2012
IN2012KOL101704.09.2012
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013118097
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2812326
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07D405/14, A61K31/4178, A61P31/12
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:ANTIVIRALE VERBINDUNGEN MIT EINEM DIBENZOOXAHETEROCYCLISCHEN TEIL[2014/51]
English:ANTIVIRAL COMPOUNDS WITH A DIBENZOOXAHETEROCYCLE MOIETY[2014/51]
French:COMPOSÉS ANTIVIRAUX AVEC UNE FRACTION DIBENZOOXAHÉTÉROCYCLE[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase20.08.2014National basic fee paid 
20.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
16.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.04.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.05.2017
03.05.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
29.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/42]
08.06.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/42]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.10.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[ID]WO2010111673  (PRESIDIO PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]; ZHONG MIN [US]; LI LEPING [US]) [ID] 1-23 * Compounds 4-9 and 4-10 in Scheme 4; compound 44;; claim - *;
 [A]WO2009102568  (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]; BACHAND CAROL [CA]; BELEMA MAKONEN [US];) [A] 1-23 * examples 8-12; claim 1 *
by applicantUS2009202478
 US2009202483
 WO2009020828
 WO2009020825
 WO2009102318
 WO2009102325
 WO2009102694
 WO2008144380
 WO2008021927
 WO2008021928
 WO2008021936
 WO2006133326
 WO2004014852
 WO2008070447
 WO2009034390
 WO2006079833
 WO2007031791
 WO2007070556
 WO2007070600
 WO2008064218
 WO2008154601
 WO2007082554
 WO2008048589
 EP2121697
 US8008264
 US8008263
 US2011217265
 US2011217261
 US8012982
 US8012942
 US8012941
 US2011223134
 WO2011106992
 WO2011106929
 US2011237636
 US2011237579
 US2011236348
 US2011250176
 US2011250172
 US2011269956
 US2011274648
 EP2385048
 US2011281910
 US2011286961
 US2011294819
 US2011293563
 US2011300104
 WO2011156543
 WO2011153396
 WO2011151652
 WO2011151651
 US2012004196
 US8093243
 US8101643
 US2012028978
 WO2012018534
 WO2012018325
 WO2012021704
 WO2012021591
 US2012040977
 US2012040962
 WO2012024363
 EP2086995
 EP2049116
 US8133884
 US2012076755
 EP2250163
 US8143414
 US8143301
 US8143288
 US2012083483
 US8147818
 WO2012039717
 WO2012041227
 WO2012041014
 EP2146984
 US8188132
 US8198449
 WO2010111673
 WO2011015657
 US4235871
 US4501728
 US4837028
 US5019369
 US2005113374
 WO2005030694
    - SZABO E; LOTZ G ET AL., PATHOL. ONCOL. RES., (2003), vol. 9, pages 215 - 221
    - HOOFNAGLE JH., HEPATOLOGY, (1997), vol. 26, pages 15S - 20
    - FRIED MW ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (2002), vol. 347, pages 975 - 982
    - JESUDIAN AB; GAMBARIN-GELWAN M; JACOBSON IM., GASTROENTEROLOGY HEPATOL., (2012), vol. 8, pages 91 - 101
    - BERGE S. M. ET AL., "Pharmaceutical Salts, a review article", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19
    - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, 18th ed.,, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1990), page 1445
    - JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE, (1977), vol. 66, pages 2 - 19
    - BANKER AND CHALMERS, Pharmaceutics and Pharmacy Practice, J.B. LIPPINCOTT COMPANY, (1982), pages 238 - 250
    - ASHP Handbook on Injectable Drugs, 4th ed.,, TOISSEL, (1986), pages 622 - 630
    - SZOKA ET AL., ANN. REV. BIOPHYS. BIOENG., (1980), vol. 9, page 467
    - WASSERMAN ET AL., CANCER, (1975), vol. 36, pages 1258 - 1268