Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2827901

EP2827901 - COMBINATION THERAPY OF A MEK INHIBITOR AND AN IGF1R INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/05]COMBINATION THERAPY OF A MEK INHIBITOR AND IGF1R INHIBITOR
[2017/13]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.07.2018
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.03.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
For all designated states
Amgen Inc.
One Amgen Center Drive
Thousand Oaks, California 91320-1799 / US
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / HUANG, Xizhong
197 Main Street
Southborough, MA 01772 / US
02 / PETERS, Malte
Erstfeldstrasse 74
4054 Basel / CH
03 / CAO, Zhu, Alexander
10 Hazelnut Street
Acton, MA 01720 / US
04 / GANSERT, Jennifer, Lorraine
337 Longbranch Road
Simi Valley, CA 93065 / US
05 / CHANG, David, Dong, Eun
24049 Chestnut Way
Calabasas, CA 91302 / US
06 / BELTRAN, Pedro
2887 Arbella Lane
Thousand Oaks, CA 91362 / US
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
5th Floor, Salisbury Square House
8, Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date13715486.013.03.2013
[2017/36]
WO2013US30781
Priority number, dateUS201261613046P20.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261613046 P
US201361763767P12.02.2013         Original published format: US 201361763767 P
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013142182
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2827901
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2827901
Date:06.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61K31/4184
[2017/13]
Former International [2015/05]A61K39/395, C07K16/28
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE MIT EINEM MEK-HEMMER UND IGF1R-HEMMER[2015/05]
English:COMBINATION THERAPY OF A MEK INHIBITOR AND AN IGF1R INHIBITOR[2017/13]
French:THÉRAPIE COMBINÉE COMPRENANT UN INHIBITEUR DE MEK ET UN INHIBITEUR DE IGFR1[2017/16]
Former [2015/05]COMBINATION THERAPY OF A MEK INHIBITOR AND IGF1R INHIBITOR
Former [2015/05]THÉRAPIE COMBINÉE
Entry into regional phase01.10.2014National basic fee paid 
01.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
05.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.2017Fee for grant paid
27.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.11.2015
Opposition(s)07.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
LU13.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/04]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
LU13.03.2018
Former [2018/52]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/39]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/35]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/24]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
IT06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/15]FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/12]FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/11]FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/09]FI06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
NO06.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
NO06.12.2017
Former [2018/07]LT06.09.2017
NO06.12.2017
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2005094376  (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US], et al) [I] 1-21 * page 2, line 6 - page 3, line 19 * * page 4, line 29 - line 30; figure 15 * * page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 11 * * page 8, line 8 - line 18 * * page 24, line 5 - line 32 * * page 60, line 26 - page 63, line 21 * * page 71, line 5 - line 14 * * page 73, line 1 - line 31 * * example 4; claims 1,4,5,9-14 *;
 [I]WO2008108986  (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [I] 1-21 * the whole document, in particular SEQ ID NOs: 136 and 32, page 74, lines 6-20 and page 90, line 31 - page 91, line 10, example 15 *;
 [I]WO2008106168  (OSI PHARM INC [US]) [I] 1-21 * paragraphs [0027] , [0 29] , [0 30] , [0063] - [0065] - [0093] - [0095] - [0223] - [0229] - [0240] - [0243] - [0284] - [0293]; figure 6; claims 1,6-8,15-17 *;
 [YD]WO03077914  (ARRAY BIOPHARMA INC [US], et al) [YD] 1-21 * the whole document, in particular page 22, third paragraph *;
 [YD]WO2006069202  (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [YD] 1-21 * the whole document, in particular page 47, line 34 - page 48, line 5 *;
 [T]  - U.S. National Institutes of Health, "A Study of MEK162 and AMG 479 in Patients With Selected Solid Tumors", (20120322), URL: http://clinicaltrials.gov/show/NCT01562899, (20130822), XP002711623 [T] * the whole document *
by applicantWO03007791
 US7871611
 WO03077914
    - HOLFORD, N. H. G.; SCHEINER, L. B., CLIN. PHARMACOKINET, (1981), vol. 6, pages 429 - 453,
    - LOEWE, S.; MUISCHNEK, H., ARCH. EXP. PATHOL PHARMACOL., (1926), vol. 114, pages 313 - 326,
    - CHOU, T. C.; TALALAY, P., ADV. ENZYME REGUL., (1984), vol. 22, pages 27 - 55,
    - THERASSE, JNCI, (2000), vol. 92, no. 2, page 205,
    - LEHAR J ET AL., "Synergistic drug combinations tend to improve therapeutically relevant selectivity", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2009), vol. 27, pages 659 - 66,