Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2897690

EP2897690 - RETROREFLECTIVE NAIL VARNISH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.04.2016
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.05.2016  [2016/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Crystal Shine Oy
Raatimiehenkatu 3 A 13
00140 Helsinki / FI
[2015/31]
Inventor(s)01 / RIEKKINEN, Antti Pekka
Poste Restante
00880 Helsinki / FI
02 / BRANDER, Miika Tuomas.
Käenkuja 8d 26
00500 Helsinki / FI
 [2015/31]
Representative(s)Seppo Laine Oy
Porkkalankatu 24
00180 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2015/31]Laurén, Hanna , et al
Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen Ab
Iso-Roobertinkatu 4-6 A
00120 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date13715720.220.02.2013
WO2013FI50193
Priority number, dateFI2012000015420.09.2012         Original published format: FI 20120154
[2015/31]
Filing languageFI
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014044902
Date:27.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2897690
Date:29.07.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2014
[2015/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61Q3/02, A61K8/29, A61K8/25, A61K8/02
[2015/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
TitleGerman:RETROREFLEKTIERENDER NAGELLACK[2015/31]
English:RETROREFLECTIVE NAIL VARNISH[2015/31]
French:VERNIS À ONGLES RÉTRO-RÉFLÉCHISSANT[2015/31]
Entry into regional phase16.04.2015National basic fee paid 
16.04.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
16.04.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/31]
18.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/20]
04.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2016/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.201604   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2010202991  (SIMON JEAN-CHRISTOPHE [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-7 * paragraph [0173] *;
 [X]EP1082952  (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1,3-7 * page 6; example 2 * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0046] *;
 [X]FR2908639  (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-8 * page 24 - page 25; example 5 *;
 [X]US2009047228  (GUERCHET LAURENCE [FR], et al) [X] 1,4,7,8 * page 15, paragraphs 387,401,412 - page 17 *;
 [X]US2003222247  (PUTMAN EVERLY DEAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * page 6; example 2 *