Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810413

EP2810413 - APPARATUS SUITABLE FOR USE IN AN ADVANCED DIGITAL BASEBAND PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.11.2018
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[2018/52]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / ROYZ, Mikhail
35 Jack Aaron
Ottawa, Ontario K2G 6L2 / CA
02 / CAO, Carl
1462 Carmine Way
San Jose, California 95131 / US
03 / CHHATBAR, Pulin
4558 Cape Charles Drive
Plano, Texas 75024 / US
04 / GAO, Fang
No. 86 Beiyuan Road
Jiaming Garden 19-201
Beijing 100101 / CN
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Röthinger, Rainer
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2018/52]
Former [2014/50]Röthinger, Rainer
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date13716045.301.02.2013
[2018/52]
WO2013IB50875
Priority number, dateUS201261594470P03.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261594470 P
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013114335
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810413
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2810413
Date:26.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L25/00
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM LEISTUNGSSTARKEN DIGITALEN BASISBAND-PROZESSOR[2018/29]
English:APPARATUS SUITABLE FOR USE IN AN ADVANCED DIGITAL BASEBAND PROCESSOR[2014/50]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR UN PROCESSEUR DE BANDE DE BASE NUMÉRIQUE PERFORMANT[2018/29]
Former [2014/50]VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI EINEM FORTGESCHRITTENEN DIGITALEN BASISBAND-PROZESSOR
Former [2014/50]APPAREIL SE PRÊTANT À UNE UTILISATION DANS UN PROCESSEUR DE BANDE DE BASE NUMÉRIQUE AVANCÉ
Entry into regional phase13.08.2014National basic fee paid 
13.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.12.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
26.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.2018Fee for grant paid
15.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18214299.2  / EP3493496
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.07.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
IT26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
PT26.04.2019
[2019/34]
Former [2019/33]AL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
PT26.04.2019
Former [2019/30]AL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
NL26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL26.12.2018
FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/25]FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
RS26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/24]FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
SE26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
GR27.03.2019
Former [2019/23]FI26.12.2018
HR26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
LV26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
BG26.03.2019
NO26.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI26.12.2018
LT26.12.2018
NO26.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT26.12.2018
NO26.03.2019
Cited inInternational search[XI]  - "TMS320TCI6618", (2011), pages 1 - 5, Texas Instruments, Product Bulletin, URL: http://www.ti.com/lit/ml/sprt597/sprt597.pdf, (20130610), XP002698510 [X] 1,2,4,8-11,21-25 * page 1 - page 4 * [I] 3,5-7,12-20
 [A]  - Debbie Greenstreet, "Enabling Multistandard Wireless Base Stations with TI's KeyStone SoCs", (201102), pages 1 - 9, Texas Instrument, White Paper, URL: http://www.ti.com/lit/wp/spry160/spry160.pdf, (20130610), XP002698511 [A] 1-25 * page 3 - page 7 * * figures 1, 2 *
 [A]  - JEFF HOFFMAN ET AL, "Architecture of the Scalable Communications Core", NETWORKS-ON-CHIP, 2007. NOCS 2007. FIRST INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PI, (20070501), ISBN 978-0-7695-2773-4, pages 40 - 52, XP031090743 [A] 1-25 * page 1 - page 6, column l *
 [A]  - "Multicore Axxia Communication Processor (ACP)", (201002), pages 1 - 2, LSI, Product Brief, URL: http://www.eetrend.com/files-eetrend/datasheet/201002/100024206-11060-lsipb2pgaxxiaclr.pdf, (20130610), XP002698512 [A] 1-25 * the whole document *