Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2822769

EP2822769 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DEPOSITING LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stratasys Ltd.
2 Holzman Street
Science Park
P.O. Box 2496
7612401 Rechovot / IL
[2015/03]
Inventor(s)01 / TEKEN, Avraham
11 Itzhak Rabin Street
7080000 Gan-Yavne / IL
02 / AKNIN, Moshe
9 Emek Ha'Ela Street
7174787 ModiIn / IL
03 / BRUSILOVSKI, Gregory
12/1 Nelkin Street
4465323 Kfar-Saba / IL
 [2015/03]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2016/39]
Former [2015/03]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13716066.904.03.2013
[2016/39]
WO2013IL50194
Priority number, dateUS201261606417P04.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261606417 P
[2015/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013132484
Date:12.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2822769
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013
[2015/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2822769
Date:28.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/14
[2015/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ABSCHEIDEN VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN[2015/03]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DEPOSITING LIQUIDS[2015/03]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉPÔT DE LIQUIDES[2015/03]
Entry into regional phase03.10.2014National basic fee paid 
03.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/03]
12.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.08.2016Fee for grant paid
15.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.07.2016
Opposition(s)29.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.03.2013
AL28.09.2016
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE04.03.2017
LU04.03.2017
MT04.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/47]AL28.09.2016
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE04.03.2017
LU04.03.2017
MT04.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/43]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE04.03.2017
LU04.03.2017
MT04.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/13]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE04.03.2017
LU04.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/10]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
LU04.03.2017
Former [2017/52]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/32]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT28.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]US2011242237  (UEZAWA HARUHISA [JP]) [A] 1-30 * paragraphs [0022] - [0030] * * figures 2,3 *;
 [AD]US2010191360  (NAPADENSKY EDUARDO [IL], et al) [AD] 1-30 * paragraphs [0227] - [0246] * * figure 3 *;
 [AD]US7500846  (ESHED DAVID [IL], et al) [AD] 1-30 * column 9, line 43 - column 10, line 25 * * column 11, line 59 - column 12, line 36 * * figures 2E, 2F *
by applicantUS6259962
 US6569373
 US6658314
 US6850334
 US7183335
 US7209797
 US7225045
 US7300619
 US7479510
 US7500846
 US7658976
 US7962237
 US2010191360