Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2825485

EP2825485 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EFFECTIVELY COMPILING COMMISSION PALLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Grenzebach Maschinenbau GmbH
Albanusstrasse 1-3
86663 Asbach-Baeumenheim / DE
[2015/04]
Inventor(s)01 / BAUMANN, Michael
Kanalstrasse 10a
85774 Unterföhring / DE
 [2015/04]
Representative(s)Kindermann, Peter
Patentanwälte Kindermann
Postfach 10 02 34
85593 Baldham / DE
[2016/10]
Former [2015/04]Kindermann, Peter
Kindermann Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 02 34
85593 Baldham / DE
Application number, filing date13716184.012.03.2013
[2016/10]
WO2013DE00135
Priority number, dateDE2012100499013.03.2012         Original published format: DE102012004990
[2015/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013135227
Date:19.09.2013
Language:DE
[2013/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2825485
Date:21.01.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2013
[2015/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2825485
Date:09.03.2016
Language:DE
[2016/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:B65G1/137
[2015/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/04]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM EFFEKTIVEN ZUSAMMENSTELLEN VON KOMMISSIONS-PALETTEN[2015/04]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EFFECTIVELY COMPILING COMMISSION PALLETS[2015/04]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DESTINÉS À ASSEMBLER EFFICACEMENT DES PALETTES D'EXPÉDITION DE COMMANDE[2015/04]
Entry into regional phase13.08.2014National basic fee paid 
13.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/04]
30.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.2015Fee for grant paid
07.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.09.2015
Opposition(s)12.12.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.03.2013
AL09.03.2016
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
MK09.03.2016
MT09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
TR09.03.2016
IE12.03.2016
LU12.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
FR09.05.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU12.03.2013
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
MK09.03.2016
MT09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
TR09.03.2016
IE12.03.2016
LU12.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
FR09.05.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2018/30]HU12.03.2013
CY09.03.2016
CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MC09.03.2016
MK09.03.2016
MT09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
IE12.03.2016
LU12.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
FR09.05.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/47]CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
MT09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
IE12.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
FR09.05.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/26]CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SI09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
IE12.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
FR09.05.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/19]CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
IE12.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
BG09.06.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/07]CZ09.03.2016
DK09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
IE12.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2017/03]CZ09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
IT09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2016/51]CZ09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
PT11.07.2016
Former [2016/50]CZ09.03.2016
EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RO09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
SK09.03.2016
SM09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE09.03.2016
ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/48]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
IS09.07.2016
Former [2016/40]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
NL09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
Former [2016/39]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
LV09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
RS09.03.2016
SE09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
Former [2016/36]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
LT09.03.2016
PL09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
Former [2016/35]ES09.03.2016
FI09.03.2016
HR09.03.2016
NO09.06.2016
GR10.06.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]DE102008035178  (SWISSLOG AG [CH]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *;
 [AD]WO2008068264  (KUKA ROBOTER GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1,7 * abstract *
by applicantWO2008068264
 DE102009056639
 DE202011003469U