Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811903

EP2811903 - GAS SAMPLING DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.04.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.05.2019  [2019/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / NIJSEN, Tamara Mathea Elisabeth
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / JANSSEN, Anthonius Petrus Gerardus Emanuel
c/o High Tech Campus Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Steffen, Thomas
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Steffen, Thomas
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date13716385.308.02.2013
WO2013IB51064
Priority number, dateUS201261596781P09.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261596781 P
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013118098
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811903
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/097, A61B5/08, G01N1/22
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:PROBENAHMEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN[2014/51]
English:GAS SAMPLING DEVICE AND METHOD[2014/51]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ÉCHANTILLONNAGE DE GAZ ET PROCÉDÉ[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase09.09.2014National basic fee paid 
09.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
12.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/22]
21.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/22]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.06.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201907   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2008041172  (JAFFE MICHAEL B [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1A, 5 * * paragraphs [0050] , [0087] , [0080] , [0017] , [0032] - [0034] - [0081] , [0066] , [0075] *;
 [X]US6581595  (MURDOCK LARRY R [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1,4 * * column 4, lines 11-26 * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 32 *;
 [X]US4832042  (POPPENDIEK HEINZ F [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 2, line 3 - line 38 *
by applicantUS5826577