Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2981830

EP2981830 - MASS SPECTROMETRIC DETERMINATION OF DRUG RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 03.04.2019  [2019/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Erasmus University Medical Center Rotterdam
Dr. Molewaterplein 50
3015 GE Rotterdam / NL
[2016/06]
Inventor(s)01 / LUIDER, Theo, Marten
c/o Erasmus University Medical Center Rotterdam
Dr. Molewaterplein 50
NL-3015 GE Rotterdam / NL
02 / GOESSENS, Wilhelmus, Hubertus, Francisus
c/o Erasmus University Medical Center Rotterdam
Dr. Molewaterplein 50
NL-3015 GE Rotterdam / NL
 [2016/06]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2019/14]
Former [2016/06]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Carnegieplein 5
2517 KJ Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13716465.304.04.2013
[2016/06]
WO2013NL50255
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014163487
Date:09.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2981830
Date:10.02.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014
[2016/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2981830
Date:03.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/68
[2016/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MASSENSPEKTROMETRISCHE BESTIMMUNG EINER MEDIKAMENTENRESISTENZ[2016/06]
English:MASS SPECTROMETRIC DETERMINATION OF DRUG RESISTANCE[2016/06]
French:DÉTERMINATION DE LA PHARMACORÉSISTANCE PAR SPECTROMÉTRIE DE MASSE[2016/06]
Entry into regional phase05.10.2015National basic fee paid 
05.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
05.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/06]
22.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.09.2018
18.09.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
19.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.02.2019Fee for grant paid
20.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.11.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
16.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201705   M06   Fee paid on   16.05.2017
Cited inInternational search[XD]US8293496  (GOVORUN VADIM MARKOVICH [RU], et al) [XD] 1 * column 8, line 36 - line 39; claims 1,4 *;
 [XI]WO03087834  (AFFINIUM PHARM INC [CA], et al) [X] 12 * claims 53,54 * [I] 13,14;
 [A]WO2012023845  (UNIV ERASMUS MEDICAL CT [NL], et al) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-12 *
 [XI]  - S. K. WILCOX ET AL, "Single Ribosomal Protein Mutations in Antibiotic-Resistant Bacteria Analyzed by Mass Spectrometry", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (20011101), vol. 45, no. 11, doi:10.1128/AAC.45.11.3046-3055.2001, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 3046 - 3055, XP055091302 [X] 1-4 * abstract * * Materials and Methods; page 3049, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 3052, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3055, column 1, paragraph 3 * [I] 5-11

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.45.11.3046-3055.2001
Examination   - J. K. Lewis ET AL, "Identification of viral mutants by mass spectrometry", Proceedings National Academy of Sciences PNAS, US, (19980721), vol. 95, no. 15, doi:10.1073/pnas.95.15.8596, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 8596 - 8601, XP055389704

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.15.8596
    - Angela K. Goodenough, "Print High Resolution Mass Spectrometry Approaches for the Quantification of Proteins Using Stable Isotopically Labeled Peptide | American Pharmaceutical Review - The Review of American Pharmaceutical Business & Technology", (20110501), pages 1 - 13, URL: http://www.americanpharmaceuticalreview.com/Featured-Articles/37042-High-Resolution-Mass-Spectrometry-Approaches-for-the-Quantification-of-Proteins-Using-Stable-Isotopically-Labeled-Peptide/, (20170711), XP055389735
by applicantUS8293496
    - EIGNER ET AL., CLIN LAB, (2009), vol. 55, no. 7-8, pages 289 - 296
    - SENG ET AL., CLIN INFECT DIS, (2009), vol. 49, no. 4, pages 543 - 551
    - CAMERA; HAYS, ANAL BIOANAL CHEM, (2007), vol. 389, pages 1633 - 1638