Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2830543

EP2830543 - TIBIAL PROSTHESIS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/06]TIBIAL PROSTHESIS SYSTEMS, KITS, AND METHODS
[2017/19]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.09.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.05.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer, Inc.
1800 W. Center Street
Warsaw, IN 46580 / US
[2017/24]
Former [2015/06]For all designated states
Zimmer, Inc.
1800 West Center Street
Warsaw IN 46580 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CLAYPOOL, Jody
2476 Wildwood Trail
Warsaw, IN 46581 / US
02 / PAPROSKY, Wayne
26 North Winfield Road
Winfield, IL 60190 / US
03 / LEWALLEN, David
1120 Seventh Street SW
Rochester, MN 55902 / US
04 / STUMP, Steven
14870 Falcon Lane
Goshen, IN 46526 / US
05 / WHITE, Stephen E.
14520 Egrets Court
Fort Wayne, IN 46814 / US
 [2017/44]
Former [2015/06]01 / CLAYPOOL, Jody
2476 Wildwood Trail
Warsaw, IN 46581 / US
02 / PAPROSKY, Wayne
26 North Winfield Road
Winfield, Illinois 60190 / US
03 / LEWALLEN, David
1120 Seventh Street SW
Rochester, Minnesota 55902 / US
04 / STUMP, Steven
14870 Falcon Lane
Goshen, Indiana 46526 / US
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2017/44]
Former [2015/06]Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date13716636.928.03.2013
[2017/44]
WO2013US34286
Priority number, dateUS201261618376P30.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261618376 P
US201261740268P20.12.2012         Original published format: US 201261740268 P
US20131383666515.03.2013         Original published format: US201313836665
US20131383729415.03.2013         Original published format: US201313837294
US20131383777415.03.2013         Original published format: US201313837774
[2015/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013148954
Date:03.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2830543
Date:04.02.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013
[2015/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2830543
Date:01.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/46, A61F2/38
[2017/19]
Former International [2015/06]A61F2/46
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME FÜR SCHIENBEINPROTHESEN[2017/19]
English:TIBIAL PROSTHESIS SYSTEMS[2017/19]
French:SYSTÈMES DE PROTHÈSE TIBIALE[2017/19]
Former [2015/06]SYSTEME, KITS UND VERFAHREN FÜR SCHIENBEINPROTHESEN
Former [2015/06]TIBIAL PROSTHESIS SYSTEMS, KITS, AND METHODS
Former [2015/06]SYSTÈMES DE PROTHÈSE TIBIALE, TROUSSES ET PROCÉDÉS
Entry into regional phase28.10.2014National basic fee paid 
28.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/06]
22.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.2017Fee for grant paid
25.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.11.2015
Opposition(s)02.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
LU28.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/04]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
LU28.03.2018
Former [2018/52]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/40]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/37]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/35]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/24]AT01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/22]FI01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
NO01.02.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2012004580  (DEPUY IRELAND [GB]; ROCK MICHAEL [GB]) [X] 1,7,8,11,19 * page 10, line 1 - line 26 * * page 11, line 21 - page 12, line 12 * * page 12, line 25 - page 13, line 9 * * figures 1,4 *;
 [X]WO2012020460  (JOHNSON & JOHNSON KABUSHIKI KAISHA [JP]; TANIMOTO MASAHISA [JP]; AOKI) [X] 13,16,18 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0059] * * figures 16-26 *;
 [A]US2006111726  (FELT JEFFREY C [US] ET AL) [A] 1,13,19 * paragraph [0168] - paragraph [0169] * * figure 35 *;
 [A]US5702464  (LACKEY JENNIFER J [US] ET AL) [A] 1,13,19 * abstract * * column 4, line 47 - line 55 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US5470354  (HERSHBERGER TROY W [US] ET AL) [A] 1,13,19 * column 6, line 53 - column 9, line 20 * * figures 3,6 *
ExaminationWO2012083280
by applicantUS20100381800
 US20100424222