blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2830543


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
21.12.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.01.2019  [2019/04]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
14.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
07.09.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
31.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
10.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
27.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.05.2018  [2018/22]
29.09.2017 (Expected) grant published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
27.09.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
27.09.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
25.09.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
15.05.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
12.05.2017 Change - inventor
12.05.2017 Change - applicant published on  14.06.2017  [2017/24]
07.04.2017 Change - classification published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
07.04.2017 Change - classification published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
07.04.2017 Change - German title published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
07.04.2017 Change - English title published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
07.04.2017 Change - French title published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
28.03.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
14.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.11.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.10.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.06.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.03.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
14.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.11.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.11.2015 First examination report
23.06.2015 Amendment by applicant
05.06.2015 Change - extension states published on  08.07.2015  [2015/28]
20.03.2015 Change - inventor
13.03.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.01.2015 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  04.02.2015  [2015/06]
02.01.2015 Request for examination filed published on  04.02.2015  [2015/06]
20.11.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
31.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
29.10.2014 Change - representative
29.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.12.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
17.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
05.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
23.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication