blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2830543 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201180067430 CN201180067757 CN201380028572 CN201380028683 CN201510394094 EP11802835 EP11808493 EP13716636 EP13716637 EP14190180

More

EP16183635 EP17157909



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2012083280Global Dossier 21.06.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201113087610 15.04.2011
US201061424222 17.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2012082628Global Dossier 21.06.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201061424222 17.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2015359642Global Dossier 17.12.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201313836665 15.03.2013
US201261618376 30.03.2012
US201514833385 24.08.2015
US201313837774 15.03.2013
US201261740268 20.12.2012
US201313837294 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2013261759Global Dossier 03.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261618376 30.03.2012
US201313836586 15.03.2013
US201261740268 20.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2013261758Global Dossier 03.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261618376 30.03.2012
US201313837774 15.03.2013
US201261740268 20.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10188530Global Dossier 29.01.2019B2
US2018000612 04.01.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201314063032 25.10.2013
US201615211812 15.07.2016
US201113087610 15.04.2011
US201514660217 17.03.2015
US201061424222 17.12.2010
US201715703698 13.09.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10010330Global Dossier 03.07.2018B2
US2017156736 08.06.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201314063032 25.10.2013
US201313836665 15.03.2013
US201414304009 13.06.2014
US201113087610 15.04.2011
US201261618376 30.03.2012
US201715435620 17.02.2017
US201061424222 17.12.2010
US201261740268 20.12.2012
US201361895825 25.10.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9763807Global Dossier 19.09.2017B2
US2016324647 10.11.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201314063032 25.10.2013
US201615211812 15.07.2016
US201113087610 15.04.2011
US201514660217 17.03.2015
US201061424222 17.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9597090Global Dossier 21.03.2017B2
US2014296859 02.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314063032 25.10.2013
US201313836665 15.03.2013
US201414304009 13.06.2014
US201113087610 15.04.2011
US201261618376 30.03.2012
US201061424222 17.12.2010
US201261740268 20.12.2012
US201361895825 25.10.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9539116Global Dossier 10.01.2017B2
US2013253378 26.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201061424222 17.12.2010
US201113819116 12.12.2011
WO2011US64435 12.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9492290Global Dossier 15.11.2016B2
US2013261504 03.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261618376 30.03.2012
US201261740268 20.12.2012
US201313837294 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9427337Global Dossier 30.08.2016B2
US2015190243 09.07.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201314063032 25.10.2013
US201113087610 15.04.2011
US201514660217 17.03.2015
US201061424222 17.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9149206Global Dossier 06.10.2015B2
US2013261757 03.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201313836665 15.03.2013
US201261618376 30.03.2012
US201261740268 20.12.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9011459Global Dossier 21.04.2015B2
US2014052269 20.02.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314063032 25.10.2013
US201113087610 15.04.2011
US201061424222 17.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8603101Global Dossier 10.12.2013B2
US2012158152 21.06.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201113087610 15.04.2011
US201061424222 17.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6185557BGlobal Dossier 23.08.2017B2
JP2015513966 18.05.2015A
Priority number Date
US201313836665 15.03.2013
US201261618376 30.03.2012
WO2013US34293 28.03.2013
US201313837774 15.03.2013
US201261740268 20.12.2012
US201313837294 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6081923BGlobal Dossier 15.02.2017B2
JP2014505517 06.03.2014A
Priority number Date
US201061424222 17.12.2010
WO2011US64435 12.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6043318BGlobal Dossier 14.12.2016B2
JP2014239900 25.12.2014A
Priority number Date
US201113087610 15.04.2011
US201061424222 17.12.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5909021BGlobal Dossier 26.04.2016B2
JP2015512307 27.04.2015A
Priority number Date
US201313836665 15.03.2013
WO2013US34286 28.03.2013
US201261618376 30.03.2012
US201313837774 15.03.2013
US201261740268 20.12.2012
US201313837294 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5559437BGlobal Dossier 23.07.2014B2
JP2014508554 10.04.2014A
Priority number Date
US201113087610 15.04.2011
US201061424222 17.12.2010
WO2011US65683 17.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3335674Global Dossier 15.08.2018A3
EP3335674 20.06.2018A2
Priority number Date
US201113087610 15.04.2011
US201061424222 17.12.2010
WO2011US65683 17.12.2011
EP11808493 17.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3222252Global Dossier 28.11.2018B1
EP3222252 27.09.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201313836665 15.03.2013
US201261618376 30.03.2012
EP13716637 28.03.2013
WO2013US34293 28.03.2013
US201313837774 15.03.2013
US201261740268 20.12.2012
US201313837294 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2918235Global Dossier 04.01.2017B1
EP2918235 28.10.2015A3
EP2918235 16.09.2015A2
Priority number Date
US201414304009 13.06.2014
US201361895825 25.10.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2830544Global Dossier 21.09.2016B1
EP2830544 04.02.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201313836665 15.03.2013
US201261618376 30.03.2012
WO2013US34293 28.03.2013
US201313837774 15.03.2013
US201261740268 20.12.2012
US201313837294 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2651343Global Dossier 29.03.2017B1
EP2651343 23.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113087610 15.04.2011
US201061424222 17.12.2010
WO2011US65683 17.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2651327Global Dossier 23.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201061424222 17.12.2010
WO2011US64435 12.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105055052BGlobal Dossier 12.06.2018B
CN105055052 18.11.2015A
Priority number Date
US201113087610 15.04.2011
US201061424222 17.12.2010
CN201180067430 17.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104736105BGlobal Dossier 31.05.2017B
CN104736105 24.06.2015A
Priority number Date
US201313836665 15.03.2013
US201261618376 30.03.2012
WO2013US34293 28.03.2013
US201313837774 15.03.2013
US201261740268 20.12.2012
US201313837294 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104379094BGlobal Dossier 01.06.2016B
CN104379094 25.02.2015A
Priority number Date
US201313836665 15.03.2013
WO2013US34286 28.03.2013
US201261618376 30.03.2012
US201313837774 15.03.2013
US201261740268 20.12.2012
US201313837294 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103379880BGlobal Dossier 08.07.2015B
CN103379880 30.10.2013A
Priority number Date
US201113087610 15.04.2011
US201061424222 17.12.2010
WO2011US65683 17.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103370025Global Dossier 23.10.2013A
Priority number Date
US201061424222 17.12.2010
WO2011US64435 12.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2869007Global Dossier 19.07.2016C
CA2869007 03.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201313836665 15.03.2013
WO2013US34286 28.03.2013
US201261618376 30.03.2012
US201313837774 15.03.2013
US201261740268 20.12.2012
US201313837294 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2821927Global Dossier 07.05.2019C
CA2821927 21.06.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201061424222 17.12.2010
WO2011US64435 12.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2830543Global Dossier 01.11.2017B1
EP2830543 04.02.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201313836665 15.03.2013
WO2013US34286 28.03.2013
US201261618376 30.03.2012
US201313837774 15.03.2013
US201261740268 20.12.2012
US201313837294 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2011343440B 17.04.2014B2
AU2011343440 25.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113087610 15.04.2011
US201061424222 17.12.2010
WO2011US65683 17.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2013238046B 03.03.2016B2
AU2013238046 20.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313836665 15.03.2013
WO2013US34286 28.03.2013
US201261618376 30.03.2012
US201313837774 15.03.2013
US201261740268 20.12.2012
US201313837294 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2013238054B 02.03.2017B2
AU2013238054 20.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201313836665 15.03.2013
US201261618376 30.03.2012
WO2013US34293 28.03.2013
US201313837774 15.03.2013
US201261740268 20.12.2012
US201313837294 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2824527 16.06.2015C
CA2824527 21.06.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201113087610 15.04.2011
US201061424222 17.12.2010
WO2011US65683 17.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2868825 03.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201313836665 15.03.2013
US201261618376 30.03.2012
WO2013US34293 28.03.2013
US201313837774 15.03.2013
US201261740268 20.12.2012
US201313837294 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2597733T 20.01.2017T3
Priority number Date
US201313836665 15.03.2013
US201261618376 30.03.2012
WO2013US34293 28.03.2013
US201313837774 15.03.2013
US201261740268 20.12.2012
US201313837294 15.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2622842T 07.07.2017T3
Priority number Date
US201113087610 15.04.2011
US201061424222 17.12.2010
WO2011US65683 17.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2647544T 22.12.2017T3
Priority number Date
US201313836665 15.03.2013
WO2013US34286 28.03.2013
US201261618376 30.03.2012
US201313837774 15.03.2013
US201261740268 20.12.2012
US201313837294 15.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013148960Global Dossier 03.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201313836665 15.03.2013
US201261618376 30.03.2012
US201313837774 15.03.2013
US201261740268 20.12.2012
US201313837294 15.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013148954Global Dossier 03.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201313836665 15.03.2013
US201261618376 30.03.2012
US201313837774 15.03.2013
US201261740268 20.12.2012
US201313837294 15.03.2013