Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2827831

EP2827831 - COSMETIC SKIN COMPOSITION WITH SOOTHING EFFECT AND ITS USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.02.2018  [2018/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Coty Germany GmbH
Rheinstrasse 4E
55116 Mainz / DE
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / DOUCET, Olivier
24 Avenue de France
F-06190 Roquebrune Cap Martin / FR
02 / PUJOS, Muriel
137 avenue de La Lanterne
Le Mykonos
F-06200 Nice / FR
03 / ROBERT, Cécile
Fontaine Vauban bat B
47 rue de Roquebillière
F-06300 Nice / FR
04 / DESRIAUX, Elisabeth
Les Bastides de la Madone 79 bis
Val de Gorbio
F-06500 Menton / FR
05 / BERNINI, Dorothee
31 avenue Hector Otto
MC-90000 Monaco / MC
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstraße 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
[2015/05]
Application number, filing date13716739.119.03.2013
WO2013EP55729
Priority number, dateEP2012016020919.03.2012         Original published format: EP 12160209
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013139808
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2827831
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/34, A61K8/67, A61K8/92, A61K8/97, A61Q19/00, A61K36/738, A61P17/04, A61K8/42
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
TitleGerman:KOSMETISCHE HAUTZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT LINDERUNGSEFFEKT UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG[2015/05]
English:COSMETIC SKIN COMPOSITION WITH SOOTHING EFFECT AND ITS USE[2015/05]
French:COMPOSITION COSMÉTIQUE POUR LA PEAU AYANT UN EFFET APAISANT ET SON UTILISATION[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase10.10.2014National basic fee paid 
10.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
07.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/06]
26.09.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/06]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.04.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2002187168  (JENSEN CLAUDE JARKAE [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * example 1 *;
 [Y]JP2004238299  (ICHIMARU PHARCOS INC) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] *;
 [A]US7399880  (BETZER MARCUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 1, line 5 - line 40 * * column 3, line 1 - line 23 *;
 [A]US2009162304  (DILEVA ROSE MARIE [US]) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] *;
 [I]  - Anonymous, "Body Creamy Butter", GNPD, MINTEL, (200908), Database accession no. 1185782, XP002682467 [I] 1-18 * the whole document *
 [A]  - Anonymous, "Intensive Whitening Serum", GNPD, MINTEL, (200904), Database accession no. 1078551, XP002682468 [A] 1-18 * the whole document *
 [A]  - Anonymous, "Conditioner", GNPD, MINTEL, (200909), Database accession no. 1180159, XP002682469 [A] 1-18 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - Tamsyn SA Thring, Pauline Hili and Declan P Naughton, "Antioxidant and potential anti-inflammatory activity of extracts and formulations of white tea, rose, and witch hazel on primary human dermal fibroblast cells", Journal of Inflammation, vol. 8, doi:10.1186/1476-9255-8-27, (2011), Database accession no. 27, pages 1 - 7, URL: http://www.journal-inflammation.com/content/pdf/1476-9255-8-27.pdf, (20120828), XP002682470 [Y] 1-18 * pages 1,5; figure 1; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1476-9255-8-27
 [A]  - "CAMELINA OIL", SOAP COSMETICS CHEMICAL SPECIALTIES, MAC.NAIR-DORLAND CO. NEW YORK, US, (19971201), vol. 73, no. 12, ISSN 0091-1372, page 89, XP000771963 [A] 1-18 * page 89 *
by applicantWO9966881
    - "Modern Challenges to the Cosmetic Formulation", HERRLING; GROTH; FUCHS; ZASTROW, Conference Materials, VERLAG FUR CHEMISCHE INDUSTRIE, (1997), pages 150 - 155