Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2828678

EP2828678 - MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGE RECONSTRUCTION METHOD WITH RESPIRATORY MOT DETECTION DURING SAMPLING OF CENTRAL AND PERIPHERAL K- SPACE AREAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.06.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips GmbH
Lübeckertordamm 5
20099 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
For:DE 
Philips GmbH
Lübeckertordamm 5
20099 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / GDANIEC, Nadine
c/o PHILIPS IP & S
High Tech Campus 44
NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / EGGERS, Holger
c/o PHILIPS IP & S
High Tech Campus 44
NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Steffen, Thomas
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Steffen, Thomas
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date13716841.522.02.2013
WO2013IB51449
Priority number, dateUS201261612522P19.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261612522 P
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013140276
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2828678
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01R33/48, G01R33/54, G01R33/561, G01R33/565, G01R33/567
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
TitleGerman:MAGNETRESONANZBILDREKONSTRUKTIONSVERFAHREN MIT RESPIRATORISCHER MOT-DETEKTION WÄHREND DER ABTASTUNG DES ZENTRALEN UND DES PERIPHEREN K-RAUM-BEREICHS[2015/05]
English:MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGE RECONSTRUCTION METHOD WITH RESPIRATORY MOT DETECTION DURING SAMPLING OF CENTRAL AND PERIPHERAL K- SPACE AREAS[2015/05]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE RECONSTRUCTION D'IMAGE PAR RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE AVEC DÉTECTION DU MOUVEMENT RESPIRATOIRE PENDANT L'ÉCHANTILLONNAGE DE ZONES D'ESPACE K CENTRALE ET PÉRIPHÉRIQUE[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase20.10.2014National basic fee paid 
20.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
16.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.03.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[AD]US2009274356  (YING LEI [US]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [I]  - MEHDI H. MOGHARI ET AL, "Compressed-sensing motion compensation (CosMo): A joint prospective-retrospective respiratory navigator for coronary MRI", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, (20110610), vol. 66, no. 6, doi:10.1002/mrm.22950, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 1674 - 1681, XP055028991 [I] 1-15 * page 1675 - page 1678; figures 1-3, 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrm.22950
 [XP]  - NADINE GDANIEC ET AL, "Novel Sampling Strategy for Abdominal Imaging with Incomplete Breathholds", PROC.INTL.SOC.MAG.RESON.MED. 20, (20120505), page 600, XP055054347 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - P LAI ET AL, "Improving Compressed Sensing Parallel Imaging using Autocalibrating Parallel Imaging Initialization with Variable Density Tiled Random k-space Sampling", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, 19TH ANNUAL MEETING AND EXHIBITION, MONTREAL, QUEBEC, 7-13 MAY 2011, (20110423), vol. 19, page 68, XP055067614 [A] 4,5,10,12 * the whole document *
 [A]  - BULLMORE E ET AL, "Wavelets and functional magnetic resonance imaging of the human brain", NEUROIMAGE, ACADEMIC PRESS, ORLANDO, FL, US, (20040101), vol. 23, doi:10.1016/J.NEUROIMAGE.2004.07.012, ISSN 1053-8119, pages S234 - S249, XP004609092 [A] 4,6-9,12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neuroimage.2004.07.012
 [A]  - SACHS T S ET AL, "REAL-TIME MOTION DETECTION IN SPIRAL MRI USING NAVIGATORS", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MN, US, (19940101), vol. 33, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 639 - 645, XP000653599 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - WANG Y ET AL, "Navigator-echo-based real-time respiratory gating and triggering for reduction of respiration effects in three-dimensional coronary MR angiography", RADIOLOGY, RADIOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF NORTH AMERICA, OAK BROOK,IL, US, (19960101), vol. 198, no. 1, ISSN 0033-8419, pages 55 - 60, XP007912646 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - DANIEL S WELLER ET AL, "Combined compressed sensing and parallel mri compared for uniform and random cartesian undersampling of K-space", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP), 2011 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20110522), doi:10.1109/ICASSP.2011.5946463, ISBN 978-1-4577-0538-0, pages 553 - 556, XP032000797 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2011.5946463
by applicantUS2009274356
    - D. S. WELLER ET AL., "Combined compressed sensing and parallel MRI compared for uniform and random cartesian undersampling of k-space", 2011 IEEE INT. CONF. ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING. PRAGUE, CZECH REPUBLIC, (201105), pages 553 - 6