Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2839543 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2839543



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 413
17.07.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
24.09.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
17.08.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
01.08.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
01.08.2018 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
01.08.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
01.08.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 33
01.08.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 33
08.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
08.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
08.06.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
08.06.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
08.06.2018 Description Search / examination 4
08.06.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
08.06.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
08.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.06.2018 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
06.02.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
06.02.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
06.02.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
06.02.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 35
06.02.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 34
17.01.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
11.01.2017 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 3
11.01.2017 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 3
27.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
27.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
27.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
27.07.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
27.07.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
27.07.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
27.07.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
27.07.2016 Description Search / examination 3
27.07.2016 Description Search / examination 3
27.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.07.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.06.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
04.04.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
04.04.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.03.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
18.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.05.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
18.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
18.05.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
18.05.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
18.05.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
18.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.01.2015 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
05.12.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
24.11.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.11.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.11.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
05.11.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
29.08.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
13.11.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 48
24.10.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
24.10.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 36
08.07.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
08.07.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
08.07.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
18.04.2013 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
18.04.2013 Claims International Searching Authority 5
18.04.2013 Description International Searching Authority 17
18.04.2013 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
18.04.2013 Drawings International Searching Authority 13