Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2839543 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380031959 EP13717148



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8981224Global Dossier 17.03.2015B2
US2014209379 31.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201414229252 28.03.2014
US201213450227 18.04.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104620444BGlobal Dossier 12.09.2017B
CN104620444 13.05.2015A
Priority number Date
US201213450227 18.04.2012
WO2013US35883 10.04.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2839543Global Dossier 12.09.2018B1
EP2839543 25.02.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201213450227 18.04.2012
WO2013US35883 10.04.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013158424Global Dossier 24.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201213450227 18.04.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US8716600Global Dossier 06.05.2014B2
US2013280936 24.10.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201213450227 18.04.2012