Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2839543

EP2839543 - CABLE CONNECTOR SYSTEMS AND METHODS INCLUDING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.07.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.08.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Raychem GmbH
Finsinger Feld 1
85521 Ottobrunn / DE
[2018/37]
Former [2017/07]For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn PA 19312 / US
For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Raychem GmbH
Finsinger Feld 1
85521 Ottobrunn / DE
Former [2015/09]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Raychem GmbH
Finsinger Feld 1
85521 Ottobrunn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SPALDING, Matthew
19712 Beneteau Court
Cornelius, North Carolina 28301 / US
02 / KEHL, Ladislaus
Von-Vollmar-Str. 12
82008 Unterhaching / DE
 [2015/09]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2018/37]
Former [2015/09]Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London
W6 0LE / GB
Application number, filing date13717148.410.04.2013
[2018/37]
WO2013US35883
Priority number, dateUS20121345022718.04.2012         Original published format: US201213450227
[2015/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013158424
Date:24.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2839543
Date:25.02.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2013
[2015/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2839543
Date:12.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01R4/70, H01R13/52
[2015/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME FÜR KABELVERBINDUG UND VERFAHREN[2018/08]
English:CABLE CONNECTOR SYSTEMS AND METHODS INCLUDING SAME[2015/09]
French:SYSTÈMES ET MÉTHODE DE CONNEXION DE CABLE[2018/08]
Former [2015/09]KABELVERBINDERSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN DAMIT
Former [2015/09]SYSTÈMES CONNECTEURS DE CÂBLE ET PROCÉDÉS LES COMPRENANT
Entry into regional phase14.11.2014National basic fee paid 
14.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/09]
18.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.06.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
08.06.2018Fee for grant paid
08.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.08.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
01.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.04.2016
Opposition(s)13.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
DK12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
MC12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SI12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
[2020/02]
Former [2019/37]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
DK12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SI12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
Former [2019/34]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
DK12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
NO12.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT12.09.2018
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US5804767  (WINFIELD PHILLIP ROLAND [GB] ET AL) [X] 1,6,14,15,18-20,22 * figure 1 * * column 6, line 49 - column 7, line 60 * [Y] 9-13,16,17,21,23 [I] 2-5,7,8;
 [I]US2008314617  (PEARCE DAVID [GB] ET AL) [I] 1,10,13,15,19,22 * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0031] - [0039] - [ 0050] , [ 0065] *;
 [I]DE1893605U  (MONETTE ASBESTDRAHT G M B H [DE]) [I] 1,19,22 * figure 1 * * page 4, line 7 - line 15 *;
 [Y]US2010181099  (KAMEDA FLOYD [US] ET AL) [Y] 9,13,16 * figures 13, 14, 17 * * paragraphs [0015] , [ 0039] - paragraphs [0040] , [ 0042] *;
 [Y]US2002046865  (BERTINI GLEN J [US] ET AL) [Y] 10,11,17,21,23 * figures 14, 15 * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065] *;
 [Y]US4511415  (DIENES ZOLTAN B [US]) [Y] 12 * figure 9 * * column 4, line 29 - line 40 *
ExaminationUS4583804
 US5567170