Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2847843

EP2847843 - PHOTOVOLTAIC SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A PHOTOVOLTAIC SYSTEM FOR FEEDING ELECTRICAL POWER INTO A MEDIUM-VOLTAGE NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 14.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMA Solar Technology AG
Sonnenallee 1
34266 Niestetal / DE
For all designated states
Adensis GmbH
Industriestrasse 65
01129 Dresden / DE
[2018/13]
Former [2015/12]For all designated states
SMA Solar Technology AG
Sonnenallee 1
34266 Niestetal / DE
For all designated states
Adensis GmbH
Industriestrasse 65
01129 Dresden / DE
Inventor(s)01 / FALK, Andreas
Neckarweg 38
34131 Kassel / DE
02 / BECK, Bernhard
Marienstrasse 13
97332 Volkbach-Dimbach / DE
03 / GERDEMANN, Aaron, Philipp
Lessingstrasse 16
34119 Kassel / DE
04 / NIEBLING, Frank
Lange Strasse 50c
34260 Kaufungen / DE
 [2015/12]
Representative(s)Lahnor, Peter
SMA Solar Technology AG
Corporate Intellectual Property Management
Sonnenallee 1
34266 Niestetal / DE
[2018/13]
Former [2015/12]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date13718853.829.04.2013
[2018/13]
WO2013EP58864
Priority number, dateDE20121010400507.05.2012         Original published format: DE102012104005
[2015/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013167407
Date:14.11.2013
Language:DE
[2013/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2847843
Date:18.03.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2013
[2015/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2847843
Date:28.03.2018
Language:DE
[2018/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:H02J3/38, H02M7/5387
[2017/48]
Former International [2015/12]H02J3/38
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/12]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PHOTOVOLTAIKANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER PHOTOVOLTAIKANLAGE ZUR EINSPEISUNG VON ELEKTRISCHER LEISTUNG IN EIN MITTELSPANNUNGSNETZ[2015/12]
English:PHOTOVOLTAIC SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A PHOTOVOLTAIC SYSTEM FOR FEEDING ELECTRICAL POWER INTO A MEDIUM-VOLTAGE NETWORK[2015/12]
French:INSTALLATION PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE INSTALLATION PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE POUR L'ALIMENTATION EN PUISSANCE ÉLECTRIQUE D'UN RÉSEAU ÉLECTRIQUE MOYENNE TENSION[2015/12]
Entry into regional phase05.12.2014National basic fee paid 
05.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/12]
08.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2018Fee for grant paid
14.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.12.2017
Opposition(s)03.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MC28.03.2018
MT28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SI28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
IE29.04.2018
LU29.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/19]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MC28.03.2018
MT28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
IE29.04.2018
LU29.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/12]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MC28.03.2018
MT28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
LU29.04.2018
CH30.04.2018
LI30.04.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
DK28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MC28.03.2018
MT28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
LU29.04.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/06]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MC28.03.2018
MT28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2019/03]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MT28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
PT30.07.2018
Former [2018/52]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MT28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
SM28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/50]AL28.03.2018
CZ28.03.2018
EE28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MT28.03.2018
PL28.03.2018
RO28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
SK28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/47]AL28.03.2018
ES28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MT28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/46]AL28.03.2018
FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MT28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/43]FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
MT28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/40]FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
LV28.03.2018
RS28.03.2018
SE28.03.2018
BG28.06.2018
NO28.06.2018
GR29.06.2018
Former [2018/35]FI28.03.2018
HR28.03.2018
LT28.03.2018
NO28.06.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]DE3236071  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2190110  (SMA SOLAR TECHNOLOGY AG [DE]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0004] , [0025]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE202009018199U  (CHANGETEC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0036] *;
 [A]US4481378  (LESK ISRAEL A [US]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *
 [A]  - Anonymous, "PV-Netzintegration", (20120401), pages 1 - 36, SMA Homepage, URL: http://files.sma.de/dl/10040/PV-Netzint-ADE123016w.pdf, (20130909), XP002713041 [A] 1-18 * page 32 *
by applicant   - C. CORVI, "Enel's 3-MW Power Station Preliminary Design", 10TH EUROPEAN PHOTOVOLTAIK SOLAR ENERGY CONFERENCE