Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2820609

EP2820609 - TOOLS AND METHODS FOR DIFFERENTIATING SCORES IN PRODUCT TESTING ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.02.2019  [2019/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
[2015/02]
Inventor(s)01 / FOLEY, Mary Michele
1388 W. Timber Trail
Whitehall, Michigan 49461 / US
02 / SAVANT, Lotika
3712 Mona Kai Boulevard
Norton Shores, Michigan 49444 / US
03 / CARR, Bernard Thomas
2618 Harrison Street
Evanston, Illinois 60201 / US
 [2015/02]
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2015/02]
Application number, filing date13719237.327.02.2013
WO2013IB51576
Priority number, dateUS201261604836P29.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261604836 P
[2015/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013128388
Date:06.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2820609
Date:07.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013
[2015/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06Q30/02
[2015/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/02]
TitleGerman:WERKZEUGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSCHEIDUNG VON BEWERTUNGEN IN PRODUKTTESTUMGEBUNGEN[2015/02]
English:TOOLS AND METHODS FOR DIFFERENTIATING SCORES IN PRODUCT TESTING ENVIRONMENTS[2015/02]
French:OUTILS ET PROCÉDÉS DE DIFFÉRENCIATION DE SCORES DANS DES ENVIRONNEMENTS DE TEST DE PRODUIT[2015/02]
Entry into regional phase26.08.2014National basic fee paid 
26.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
19.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/06]
27.09.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/06]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.01.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201806   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search   [ ] - No relevant documents disclosed