Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2841919

EP2841919 - MULTI-APPLICATION APPROACH FOR PHOTOMETRIC DETERMINATION OF AN ANALYTE IN A FLUID SAMPLE ON AN AUTOMATED ANALYZER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.09.2019
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.07.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02]
Applicant(s)For:DE 
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[2018/47]
Former [2015/10]For:DE 
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / KURTZ, Georg
Kappellenwiese 38
82377 Penzberg / DE
02 / LOPEZ-CALLE, Eloisa
benckiserstrasse 65
67059 Ludwigshafen / DE
 [2015/10]
Representative(s)Schwarz, Ralf , et al
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung, Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
[2018/47]
Former [2015/10]Poredda, Andreas
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Patentabteilung
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date13719520.225.04.2013
[2018/47]
WO2013EP58674
Priority number, dateEP2012000295226.04.2012         Original published format: EP 12002952
EP2012019603607.12.2012         Original published format: EP 12196036
EP2012019888121.12.2012         Original published format: EP 12198881
[2015/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013160424
Date:31.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2841919
Date:04.03.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2013
[2015/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2841919
Date:21.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/25, G01N33/53, G01N21/27
[2015/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/10]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MEHRFACHANWENDUNGSANSATZ ZUR PHOTOMETRISCHEN BESTIMMUNG EINES ANALYTS IN EINER FLÜSSIGKEITSPROBE IN EINEM AUTOMATISIERTEN ANALYSEGERÄT[2015/10]
English:MULTI-APPLICATION APPROACH FOR PHOTOMETRIC DETERMINATION OF AN ANALYTE IN A FLUID SAMPLE ON AN AUTOMATED ANALYZER[2015/10]
French:APPROCHE MULTI-APPLICATION POUR DÉTERMINATION PHOTOMÉTRIQUE D'UN ANALYTE DANS UN ÉCHANTILLON DE FLUIDE SUR UN ANALYSEUR AUTOMATIQUE[2015/10]
Entry into regional phase26.11.2014National basic fee paid 
26.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.08.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/10]
02.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
11.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.2018Fee for grant paid
11.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.06.2016
Opposition(s)22.08.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
09.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
EE21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
MC21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RO21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
SI21.11.2018
SK21.11.2018
SM21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
[2020/02]
Former [2019/50]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
EE21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RO21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
SI21.11.2018
SK21.11.2018
SM21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/40]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
EE21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RO21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
SK21.11.2018
SM21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/37]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
EE21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RO21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
SM21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/35]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
CZ21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
PL21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/34]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
DK21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL21.11.2018
AT21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
PT21.03.2019
Former [2019/25]AT21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
RS21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/24]AT21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
SE21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
GR22.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/23]AT21.11.2018
FI21.11.2018
HR21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
LV21.11.2018
NL21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
BG21.02.2019
NO21.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI21.11.2018
LT21.11.2018
NO21.02.2019
IS21.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT21.11.2018
NO21.02.2019
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2009045342  (STERLING BERNHARD B [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0110] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0113] * * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0120] * * paragraph [0123] * * paragraph [0130] * * claim 52 * * paragraph [0003] * [I] 2-15;
 [A]EP1460414  (ARKRAY INC [JP]) [A] 11 * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0029] *;
 [A]US2011223066  (YAMAZAKI ISAO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] *
Examination   - Thomas Bertsch ET AL, "Multicentre analytical evaluation of a new point-of-care system for the determination of cardiac and thromboembolic markers.", Clin. Lab., (20100101), vol. 56, pages 37 - 49, XP055281073