Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2839554

EP2839554 - FREQUENCY TUNABLE LASER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.08.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SK
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
30.08.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO
Anna van Buerenplein 1
2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL
[2015/17]
Former [2015/09]For all designated states
Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
Inventor(s)01 / NIEUWLAND, Remco Alexander
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
02 / DE BOER, Bart Michiel
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
2628 VK Delft / NL
 [2018/43]
Former [2015/09]01 / NIEUWLAND, Remco Alexander
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
NL-2628 VK Delft / NL
02 / DE BOER, Bart Michiel
c/o TNO-PLT
Schoemakerstraat 97
NL-2628 VK Delft / NL
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2018/43]
Former [2015/09]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13719631.717.04.2013
[2018/43]
WO2013NL50276
Priority number, dateEP2012016464518.04.2012         Original published format: EP 12164645
[2015/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013157942
Date:24.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2839554
Date:25.02.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2013
[2015/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2839554
Date:24.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01J9/02, H01S5/00, H01S5/0687, H01S3/13, G01N21/25, H01S5/062, H01S5/14
[2018/22]
Former International [2015/09]H01S5/062, H01S5/14, G01J3/28
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LASERSYSTEM MIT FREQUENZABSTIMMUNG[2018/22]
English:FREQUENCY TUNABLE LASER SYSTEM[2015/09]
French:SYSTÈME LASER À FRÉQUENCE RÉGLABLE[2018/22]
Former [2015/09]FREQUENZABSTIMMBARES LASERSYSTEM
Former [2015/09]SYSTÈME LASER ACCORDABLE EN FRÉQUENCE
Entry into regional phase27.10.2014National basic fee paid 
27.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/09]
20.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2018Fee for grant paid
11.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.01.2016
Opposition(s)25.07.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
23.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL24.10.2018
AT24.10.2018
CZ24.10.2018
DK24.10.2018
EE24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
IT24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RO24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
SK24.10.2018
SM24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
PT24.02.2019
[2019/40]
Former [2019/37]AL24.10.2018
AT24.10.2018
CZ24.10.2018
DK24.10.2018
EE24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
IT24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RO24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
SM24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
PT24.02.2019
Former [2019/35]AL24.10.2018
AT24.10.2018
CZ24.10.2018
DK24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
IT24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
PT24.02.2019
Former [2019/34]AL24.10.2018
AT24.10.2018
DK24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
IT24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
PT24.02.2019
Former [2019/26]AL24.10.2018
AT24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
PT24.02.2019
Former [2019/25]AT24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
RS24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
SE24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
GR25.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT24.10.2018
ES24.10.2018
FI24.10.2018
HR24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
LV24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
PL24.10.2018
BG24.01.2019
NO24.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI24.10.2018
LT24.10.2018
NO24.01.2019
IS24.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT24.10.2018
NO24.01.2019
Cited inInternational search[A]US2004245441  (PIETERSE JAN-WILLEM [US] ET AL) [A] 1,9,12,14 * paragraphs [0009] , [0012] - [0014] - [0024] - [0028]; figure 1 *;
 [AD]US2005134861  (KRINGLEBOTN JON T [NO] ET AL KRINGLEBOTN JON THOMAS [NO] ET AL) [AD] 1,9,12,14 * paragraphs [0025] - [0032]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2006131488  (THINGBO DAG [NO] ET AL) [A] 1,9,12,14 * paragraphs [0019] - [0026]; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US2010296089  (WEBB MICHAEL B [US] ET AL) [A] 1,9,12,14 * paragraphs [0029] - [0038]; figure 1 *;
 [A]  - TUCKER J R ET AL, "EFFECT OF MULTIPLE TRANSVERSE MODES IN SELF-MIXING SENSORS BASED ON VERTICAL-CAVITY SURFACE-EMITTING LASERS", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (20070201), vol. 46, no. 4, doi:10.1364/AO.46.000611, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 611 - 619, XP001504413 [A] 1,9,12,14 * pages 612, 617; figures 1,7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.46.000611
 [AD]  - GIULIANI, "Laser diode self-mixing technique for sensing applications", J. OPT. A: PURE APPL. OPT., (2002), vol. 4, pages S283 - S294, XP002510274 [AD] 1,9,12,14 * page s283 - page s285; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1464-4258/4/6/371
ExaminationUS2007091295
by applicantUS2005134861
    - J. OPT. A: PURE APPL. OPT., (2002), vol. 4, pages S283 - S294