Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: WO2013153173

WO2013153173 - VIBRATION ISOLATOR AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.06.2015
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.07.2015  [2015/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sebert Schwingungstechnik GmbH
Hans-Böckler-Strasse 35
73230 Kirchheim/Teck / DE
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / SEBERT, Karl
Hans-Böckler-Strasse 35
73230 Kirchheim/Teck / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date13719760.411.04.2013
WO2013EP57618
Priority number, dateDE20121020601512.04.2012         Original published format: DE102012206015
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013153173
Date:17.10.2013
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2013
[2013/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:F16F7/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR 
TitleGerman:SCHWINGUNGSISOLATOR UND VERFAHREN DESSEN HERSTELLUNG
English:VIBRATION ISOLATOR AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF
French:ISOLATEUR DE VIBRATIONS ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/30]
13.11.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/30]
11.02.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2015/30]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XI]SU1442744  (BUSAROV YURIJ P [SU], et al) [X] 1-7,12 * the whole document * [I] 8,9;
 [XI]WO8303647  (PEDERSON REGNOR [NO]) [X] 1,2,7 * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 12; figure -; claim - * [I] 3-6,8-12;
 [XI]EP0499518  (AEROFLEX INT INC [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8,12 * column 1, line 40 - column 5, line 16; figure -; claim - * [I] 3-6,9-11;
 [XI]EP1122458  (ENIDINE INC [US]) [X] 1,2,7 * paragraphs [0008] - [0034]; figure -; claim - * [I] 3-6,8-12;
 [ID]DE102008008303  (SEBERT SCHWINGUNGSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [ID] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [XDI]EP1666760  (ENIDINE INC [US]) [XD] 1,3-7,12 * the whole document * [I] 2,8-11;
 [I]JP2004169533  (SAKAIYA SADAO) [I] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE10320737  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,7 * the whole document *
by applicantDE102008008303
 EP1132646
 EP1666760