blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: WO2013153173 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   WO2013153173



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 120
12.06.2015 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
03.06.2015 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
11.02.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) Search / examination 3
27.01.2015 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 6
19.12.2014 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) Search / examination 3
29.10.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
22.08.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
05.11.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
17.10.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
17.10.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
17.10.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 27
26.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
26.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
26.06.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
11.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
11.04.2013 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
11.04.2013 Claims PCT receiving Office 4
11.04.2013 Description PCT receiving Office 17
11.04.2013 Drawings PCT receiving Office 4