Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2819945

EP2819945 - PERFORATION DEVICE TO PERFORATE CLOSED RECEPTACLES CONTAINING COLORING PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 08.05.2019  [2019/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COROB S.P.A. CON UNICO SOCIO
Via dell'Agricoltura 103
41038 San Felice Sul Panaro / IT
[2016/01]
Former [2015/51]For all designated states
CPS Color Equipment S.p.A. con unico socio
Via dell'Agricoltura 103
41038 San Felice sul Panaro, MO / IT
Former [2015/02]For all designated states
COROB S.P.A. CON SOCIO UNICO
Via dell'Agricoltura 103
41038 San Felice Sul Panaro (MO) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / BENATTI, Fabrizio
Via Ronchi 2
I-41032 Cavezzo / IT
 [2015/02]
Representative(s)Petraz, Davide Luigi , et al
GLP S.r.l
Viale Europa Unita, 171
33100 Udine / IT
[2016/36]
Former [2015/02]Petraz, Gilberto Luigi , et al
GLP S.r.l.
Viale Europa Unita, 171
33100 Udine / IT
Application number, filing date13720007.727.02.2013
[2016/36]
WO2013IB00337
Priority number, dateIT2012UD0003228.02.2012         Original published format: IT UD20120032
[2015/02]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013128269
Date:06.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2819945
Date:07.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013
[2015/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2819945
Date:07.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:B67B7/48
[2015/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/02]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PERFORATIONSVORRICHTUNG ZUM PERFORIEREN GESCHLOSSENER, FÄRBEPRODUKTE ENTHALTENDER BEHÄLTER[2015/02]
English:PERFORATION DEVICE TO PERFORATE CLOSED RECEPTACLES CONTAINING COLORING PRODUCTS[2015/02]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PERFORATION POUR PERFORER DES RÉCIPIENTS FERMÉS CONTENANT DES PRODUITS COLORANTS[2015/02]
Entry into regional phase26.08.2014National basic fee paid 
26.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
09.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2016Fee for grant paid
29.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.12.2015
Opposition(s)08.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL07.09.2016
AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
IE27.02.2017
LU27.02.2017
MT27.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
[2019/19]
Former [2018/47]AL07.09.2016
AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
LU27.02.2017
MT27.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/43]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
LU27.02.2017
MT27.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/04]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
LU27.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/51]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/45]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/37]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/32]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/13]ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
Former [2017/11]ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT07.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]GB2048825  (WINTER OY) [A] 1 * page 2, line 8 - line 24; figure 1 *;
 [A]US6240559  (CARES PAUL [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]FR1589435  (PERRIN JEAN) [A] 1 * figure 1 *
by applicantIT1279712
 GB2048825