Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809791

EP2809791 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SOLID MALTITOL FROM STARCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/50]MALTITOL POWDER
[2019/17]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.09.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 30.10.2019 [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cargill, Incorporated
15407 McGinty Road West
Wayzata, MN 55391 / US
[2019/44]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
Cargill, Incorporated
15407 McGinty Road West
Wayzata, MN 55391 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FURLAN, Tiziano
Via Santa Caterina 9
I-45100 Rovigo / IT
02 / NATALONI, Luigi
Via Spina 3
I-40139 Bologna / IT
03 / TOLOMELLI, Patrizia
Via Castelletto 54
I-44124 Ferrara / IT
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Jantschy, Jasmin , et al
Cargill R&D Centre Europe BVBA
Bedrijvenlaan 9
2800 Mechelen / BE
[2019/44]
Former [2014/50]Kiadi Matsuela, Dela , et al
Cargill Europe bvba
Bedrijvenlaan 9
2800 Mechelen / BE
Application number, filing date13720016.824.01.2013
[2019/44]
WO2013IB00630
Priority number, dateEP2012000062331.01.2012         Original published format: EP 12000623
EP2012000137629.02.2012         Original published format: EP 12001376
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013114219
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2809791
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2809791
Date:30.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:C12P19/12, C12P19/14, C12P19/16, C12P19/22, C07H15/04
[2019/17]
Former International [2014/50]C12P19/12, C12P19/14, C12P19/16, C12P19/22
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FESTEM MALTIT AUS STÄRKE[2019/17]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SOLID MALTITOL FROM STARCH[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE MALTITOL SOLIDE À PARTIR D'AMIDON[2019/17]
Former [2014/50]MALTITOLPULVER
Former [2014/50]MALTITOL POWDER
Former [2014/50]POUDRE DE MALTITOL
Entry into regional phase31.07.2014National basic fee paid 
31.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
31.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2019Fee for grant paid
23.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.05.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[I]DE1935330  (HAYASHIBARA CO) [I] 1-9 * page 4, line 5 - page 5, line 24 * * page 7, line 4 - page 12, line 12 * * page 22, line 9 - page 31, line 3 *;
 [A]JP2002101896  ;
 [A]US4487198  (MIYAKE TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 55 * * column 3 - column 4; example 1; tables I, II; compound Maltose H *;
 [AD]WO2005014608  (CARGILL INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-9 * page 5, line 22 - page 9, line 3 * * page 10, line 12 - line 25 * * page 11, line 26 - page 14, line 20 * * page 16 - page 17; claims 1-5 *;
 [A]WO0204473  (XYROFIN OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 1, line 12 - line 19 * * page 9; example 2 * * page 10; example 4 * * page 10 - page 11; example 5 * * page 13; table III * * page 15; table V * * page 16; table VI *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 57, Database accession no. 2002-531597, XP002681976 & JP2002101896 A 20020409 (NIPPON SHIRYO KOGYO KK) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * see patent document: * * paragraph 24 * * paragraph 52 - paragraph 59 * * paragraph 83 * * paragraph 100 - paragraph 101; example 3 *
by applicantUS5873943
 EP1656388
 WO2008029033