Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2839041

EP2839041 - COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR THE RETANNING AND FATLIQUORING OF LEATHER, AND THE LEATHER PREPARED [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STAHL INTERNATIONAL B.V.
Sluisweg 10
5145 PE Waalwijk / NL
[2015/09]
Inventor(s)01 / KOMFORTH, Reiner
c/o Sluisweg 10
5145 PE Waalwijk / NL
 [2015/09]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2016/44]
Former [2015/09]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13720113.317.04.2013
[2016/44]
WO2013NL50275
Priority number, dateNL2012200866620.04.2012         Original published format: NL 2008666
[2015/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013157941
Date:24.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2839041
Date:25.02.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2013
[2015/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2839041
Date:02.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:C14C3/20, C14C9/02
[2015/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR DAS NACHGERBEN UND FETTLICKERN VON LEDER UND DAS DARAUS HERGESTELLTE LEDER[2016/21]
English:COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR THE RETANNING AND FATLIQUORING OF LEATHER, AND THE LEATHER PREPARED[2015/09]
French:COMPOSITION ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE RETANNAGE ET LA NOURRITURE EN BAIN DE CUIR ET LE CUIR AINSI OBTENU[2016/21]
Former [2015/09]ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERBRÄUNUNG UND FETTUNG VON LEDER SOWIE DAS PRÄPARIERTE LEDER
Former [2015/09]COMPOSITION ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE RETANNAGE ET LA NOURRITURE EN BAIN DE CUIR, ET CUIR AINSI PRÉPARÉ
Entry into regional phase17.11.2014National basic fee paid 
17.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/09]
20.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.09.2016Fee for grant paid
22.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.05.2016
Opposition(s)03.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.04.2013
AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
GB17.04.2017
IE17.04.2017
LU17.04.2017
MT17.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
FR02.05.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
GB17.04.2017
IE17.04.2017
LU17.04.2017
MT17.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
FR02.05.2017
Former [2018/14]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
GB17.04.2017
LU17.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
FR02.05.2017
Former [2018/07]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
FR02.05.2017
Former [2018/06]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/52]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/38]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/37]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/36]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/35]AT02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/34]AT02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/33]AT02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/26]AT02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
NL02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
NO02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV02.11.2016
Cited inInternational search[XDA]US6033590  (KOMFORTH REINER [DE], et al) [XD] 15 * column 1, line 4 - column 4, line 43 * * examples 1,4 * [A] 1-14;
 [XA]US2007021552  (LUNKWITZ RALPH [DE], et al) [X] 15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0009] , [0012] - [0029] - [0042] - [0061] - [0092] * * examples 1,3 * [A] 1-14;
 [XDA]  - BASKAR G ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF PHOSPHORYLATED FATLIQUORS AND THEIR APPLICATION IN THE MANUFACTURE OF SOPHISTICATED LEATHERS", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN LEATHER CHEMISTS ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN LEATHER CHEMISTS ASSOCIATION. CINCINNATI, US, (19910401), vol. 86, no. 4, ISSN 0002-9726, pages 159 - 165, XP000236734 [XD] 15 * the whole document * [A] 1-14
by applicantUS6033590
 US2007021552
    - BASKAR ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN LEATHER CHEMISTS ASSOCIATION, (1991), vol. 86, pages 159 - 165,