Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2678032

EP2678032 - LENTIVIRAL VECTORS CONTAINING AN MHC CLASS I PROMOTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.04.2015
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Theravectys
1 mail du Professeur Georges Mathé
94800 Villejuif / FR
[2014/01]
Inventor(s)01 / SARRY, Emeline
68, avenue Augustin Dumont
92240 Malakoff / FR
02 / BAUCHE, Cécile
104, avenue de Choisy
75013 Paris / FR
 [2014/01]
Representative(s)Lau, Sarah Jane , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/01]Lau, Sarah Jane , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date13720364.230.04.2013
WO2013EP59041
Priority number, dateEP2012030556623.05.2012         Original published format: EP 12305566
[2014/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013174630
Date:28.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2678032
Date:01.01.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2013
[2014/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2678032
Date:18.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/00
[2014/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/01]
Extension statesBA27.09.2013
ME27.09.2013
TitleGerman:LENTIVIRALE VEKTOREN MIT EINEM MHC-KLASSE-I-PROMOTOR[2014/01]
English:LENTIVIRAL VECTORS CONTAINING AN MHC CLASS I PROMOTER[2014/01]
French:VECTEURS LENTIVIRAUX CONTENANT UN PROMOTEUR DU MHC CLASSE I[2014/03]
Former [2014/01]VECTEURS LENTIVIRAUX CONTENANT UN PROMOTEUR DU CMH DE CLASSE I
Entry into regional phase27.09.2013National basic fee paid 
27.09.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
27.09.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.09.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.09.2013Examination requested  [2014/01]
20.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.04.2014Fee for grant paid
14.04.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.01.2014
Opposition(s)19.03.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/22]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.04.2013
AL18.06.2014
BG18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
MK18.06.2014
MT18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
SM18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/29]HU30.04.2013
BG18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
MK18.06.2014
MT18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
SM18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
Former [2017/39]HU30.04.2013
BG18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
MT18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
Former [2017/03]CY18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
MT18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
Former [2016/01]CY18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
Former [2015/36]CY18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
Former [2015/22]CY18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
Former [2015/12]CY18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
Former [2015/10]CY18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
Former [2014/52]CY18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
RS18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
Former [2014/48]CY18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
Former [2014/47]CY18.06.2014
Cited inInternational search[A]EP1092779  (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [AD]  - BRECKPOT K ET AL, "Lentiviral vectors for cancer immunotherapy: transforming infectious particles into therapeutics", GENE THERAPY, MACMILLAN PRESS LTD., BASINGSTOKE, GB, vol. 14, no. 11, doi:10.1038/SJ.GT.3302947, ISSN 0969-7128, (20070601), pages 847 - 862, (20070322), XP002628041 [AD] 12-14 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3302947
 [AD]  - CHINNASAMY N ET AL, "EFFICIENT GENE TRANSFER TO HUMAN PERIPHERAL BLOOD MONOCYTE-DERIVED DENDRITIC CELLS USING HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS TYPE 1-BASED LENTIVIRAL VECTORS", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, MARY ANN LIEBERT, NEW YORK ,NY, US, (20000901), vol. 11, no. 13, doi:10.1089/10430340050129512, ISSN 1043-0342, pages 1901 - 1909, XP000943471 [AD] 1-14 * page 1902, column r, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/10430340050129512
 [AD]  - SALIMA HACEIN-BEY-ABINA ET AL, "Insertional oncogenesis in 4 patients after retrovirus-mediated gene therapy of SCID-X1", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (20080902), vol. 118, no. 9, doi:10.1172/JCI35700, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 3132 - 3142, XP055038782 [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI35700
 [A]  - HE YUKAI ET AL, "Recombinant lentivector as a genetic immunization vehicle for antitumor immunity.", EXPERT REVIEW OF VACCINES DEC 2007 LNKD- PUBMED:18377355, (200712), vol. 6, no. 6, ISSN 1744-8395, pages 913 - 924, XP009163017 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1586/14760584.6.6.913