Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2828971

EP2828971 - BANDPASS SAMPLING SCHEMES FOR OBSERVATION RECEIVER FOR USE IN PA DPD SYSTEM FOR CONCURRENT MULTI-BAND SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.06.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[2019/30]
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / BAI, Chunlong
13382 Tiverton Road
San Diego 92130 / US
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Brann AB
P.O. Box 3690
Drottninggatan 27
103 59 Stockholm / SE
[2019/30]
Former [2015/05]Röthinger, Rainer
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date13720558.905.03.2013
[2019/30]
WO2013IB51753
Priority number, dateUS20121342384619.03.2012         Original published format: US201213423846
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013140286
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2828971
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2828971
Date:24.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:H03F1/32, H03F3/24, H04B1/04, H04L27/36
[2019/17]
Former International [2015/05]H03F1/32, H03F3/24, H04B1/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BANDPASS-ABTASTSCHEMATA FÜR BEOBACHTUNGSEMPFÄNGER ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM PA-DPD-SYSTEM FÜR GLEICHZEITIGE MEHRBANDSIGNALE[2015/05]
English:BANDPASS SAMPLING SCHEMES FOR OBSERVATION RECEIVER FOR USE IN PA DPD SYSTEM FOR CONCURRENT MULTI-BAND SIGNALS[2015/05]
French:PROCÉDÉS D'ÉCHANTILLONNAGE DE BANDE PASSANTE POUR RÉCEPTEUR D'OBSERVATION DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS DANS UN SYSTÈME DPD PA POUR DES SIGNAUX À MULTIPLES BANDES CONCURRENTES[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase12.09.2014National basic fee paid 
12.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.01.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
08.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.06.2019Fee for grant paid
10.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XPL]US8380144  (BAI CHUNLONG [CA] ET AL) [XP] 1-3,8-20 * the whole document * [L] 1-3,8-20;
 [XI]  - CIDRONALI A ET AL, "A new approach for concurrent Dual-Band IF Digital PreDistortion: System design and analysis", INTEGRATED NONLINEAR MICROWAVE AND MILLIMETRE-WAVE CIRCUITS, 2008. INMMIC 2008. WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081124), ISBN 978-1-4244-2645-4, pages 127 - 130, XP031404879 [X] 1-3,9-20 * page 2, column L, line 5 - page 3, column L, line 5; figures 3,4 * [I] 4-8
 [A]  - JI SUN ET AL, "A direct RF-undersampling retrodirective array system", RADIO AND WIRELESS SYMPOSIUM, 2008 IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080122), ISBN 978-1-4244-1462-8, pages 631 - 634, XP031237241 [A] 1-20 * page 631, column R, line 28 - page 634, column R, line 5; figures 2,3 *
 [A]  - YOUNGEHEOL PARK ET AL, "Adaptive predistortion linearization of rf power amplifiers using lookup tables generated from subsampled data", RADIO AND WIRELESS CONFERENCE, 2002. RAWCON 2002. IEEE AUG. 11-14, 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20020811), ISBN 978-0-7803-7458-4, pages 233 - 236, XP010601382 [A] 1-20 * page 233, column L, line 29 - page 236, column R, line 12; figures 1,2,5 *
 [A]  - YUAN-PEI LIN ET AL, "A New Iterative Algorithm for Finding the Minimum Sampling Frequency of MultiBand Signals", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20100915), vol. 58, no. 10, ISSN 1053-587X, pages 5446 - 5450, XP011312050 [A] 1-20 * page 5446, column L, line 14 - page 5450, column L, line 20; figures 1,2,3 *
 [A]  - TSENG C H ET AL, "Direct Downconversion of Multiband RF Signals Using Bandpass Sampling", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20060101), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TWC.2006.01012, ISSN 1536-1276, pages 72 - 76, XP001545710 [A] 1-20 * page 72, column L, line 15 - page 76, column R, line 12; figures 1,2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TWC.2006.01012