Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2838918

EP2838918 - METHODS AND MEANS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF HETERODIMERIC IG-LIKE MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/09]METHODS AND MEANS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF IG-LIKE MOLECULES
[2018/52]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.12.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019Change - divisional application(s)published on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merus N.V.
Yalelaan 62
3584 CM Utrecht / NL
[2017/06]
Former [2016/27]For all designated states
Merus N.V.
Padualaan 8, postvak 133
3584 CH Utrecht / NL
Former [2015/09]For all designated states
Merus B.V.
Padualaan 8 (postvak 133)
3584 CH Utrecht / NL
Inventor(s)01 / DE KRUIF, Cornelis Adriaan
c/o Yalelaan 62
3584 CM Utrecht / NL
02 / HENDRIKS, Linda Johanna Aleida
c/o Yalelaan 62
3584 CM Utrecht / NL
03 / LOGTENBERG, Ton
c/o Yalelaan 62
3584 CM Utrecht / NL
 [2019/13]
Former [2015/09]01 / DE KRUIF, Cornelis Adriaan
c/o Merus B.V.
Padualaan 8 (postvak 133)
NL-3584 CH Utrecht / NL
02 / HENDRIKS, Linda Johanna Aleida
c/o Merus B.V.
Padualaan 8 (postvak 133)
NL-3584 CH Utrecht / NL
03 / LOGTENBERG, Ton
c/o Merus B.V.
Padualaan 8 (postvak 133)
NL-3584 CH Utrecht / NL
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2019/23]
Former [2015/09]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13720615.719.04.2013
[2019/23]
WO2013NL50294
Priority number, dateUS201261635935P20.04.2012         Original published format: US 201261635935 P
[2015/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013157954
Date:24.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2838918
Date:25.02.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2013
[2015/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2838918
Date:05.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/12, C07K16/26, C07K16/36, C07K16/46, A61K39/395, A61K39/40, C07K16/18, C07K16/28, C12P21/00, A61K39/00
[2018/52]
Former International [2015/09]C07K16/12, C07K16/26, C07K16/36, C07K16/46
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/09]
Extension statesBA20.11.2014
ME20.11.2014
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND MITTEL ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HETERODIMEREN IG-LIKE-MOLEKÜLEN[2018/52]
English:METHODS AND MEANS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF HETERODIMERIC IG-LIKE MOLECULES[2018/52]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET MOYENS DE PRODUCTION DE MOLÉCULES HÉTÉRODIMÈRES DE TYPE IG[2018/52]
Former [2015/09]VERFAHREN UND MITTEL ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON IG-LIKE-MOLEKÜLEN
Former [2015/09]METHODS AND MEANS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF IG-LIKE MOLECULES
Former [2015/09]PROCÉDÉS ET MOYENS DE PRODUCTION DE MOLÉCULES DE TYPE IG
Entry into regional phase20.11.2014National basic fee paid 
20.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/09]
10.12.2015Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
11.01.2016Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
06.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.04.2019Fee for grant paid
23.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19178196.2
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.05.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
19.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2009089004  (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [X] 1,24,28,30,32,34 * the whole document * [I] 2-23,25-27,29,31,33;
 [XI]WO2011143545  (RINAT NEUROSCIENCE CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,24,28,30,32,34 * the whole document * [I] 2-23,25,26,29,31,33;
 [A]  - K. GUNASEKARAN ET AL, "Enhancing Antibody Fc Heterodimer Formation through Electrostatic Steering Effects: APPLICATIONS TO BISPECIFIC MOLECULES AND MONOVALENT IgG", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20100618), vol. 285, no. 25, doi:10.1074/jbc.M110.117382, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 19637 - 19646, XP055001947 [A] 1-34 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M110.117382
ExaminationWO2012020096
by applicantWO2004061104
 WO9850431
 WO2007110205
 EP0187045
 US2010015133
 WO2007147901
 WO2010129304
 WO2009089004
 WO2004009618
 EP0120694
 EP0314161
 EP0481790
 EP0523949
 US4816567
 WO0063403
 WO03004704
 US4801687
 US5151504
 WO2009080251
 WO2009080252
 WO2009080253
    - ELLERSON JR. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL, (1976), pages 510 - 517
    - DEISENHOFER, J. BIOCHEMISTRY, (1981), pages 2361 - 2370
    - DAVIS JH. ET AL., "Protein Engineering", DESIGN & SELECTION, (2010), pages 195 - 202
    - DEISENHOFER J., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1981), pages 2361 - 2370
    - MILLER S., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), pages 965 - 973
    - PADLAN, ADVANCES IN PROTEIN CHEMISTRY, (1996), pages 57 - 133
    - LEE; RICHARDS, J. MOL. BIOL., (1971), page 379
    - IDUSOGIE, E.E. ET AL., J.I., (2000), pages 4178 - 4184, URL: http://www.rcsb.org/pdb/explore/explore.dostrcultureId=116x