Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2852895

EP2852895 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TESTING THE DATA DISPLAY IN A SECURITY-CRITICAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.11.2015
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beckhoff Automation GmbH
Eiserstrasse 5
33415 Verl / DE
[2015/14]
Inventor(s)01 / SACHS, Jens
Auf dem Ufer 8
32469 Petershagen / DE
02 / FRÜCHTL, Martin
Ahornstraße 20
59505 Bad Sassendorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/14]01 / SACHS, Jens
Auf dem Ufer 8
32469 Petershagen / DE
02 / FRÜCHTL, Martin
Lerchenweg 8
33415 Verl / DE
Representative(s)Patentanwaltskanzlei WILHELM & BECK
Prinzenstraße 13
80639 München / DE
[2015/14]
Application number, filing date13720972.208.05.2013
WO2013EP59662
Priority number, dateDE20121020848121.05.2012         Original published format: DE102012208481
[2015/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013174658
Date:28.11.2013
Language:DE
[2013/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2852895
Date:01.04.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2013
[2015/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/16, G06F11/22, G09G5/00
[2015/14]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/14]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERPRÜFEN DER DATENANZEIGE IN EINEM SICHERHEITSKRITISCHEN SYSTEM[2015/14]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TESTING THE DATA DISPLAY IN A SECURITY-CRITICAL SYSTEM[2015/14]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE VÉRIFICATION DE L'AFFICHAGE DE DONNÉES D'UN SYSTÈME CRITIQUE EN TERMES DE SÉCURITÉ[2015/14]
Entry into regional phase17.12.2014National basic fee paid 
17.12.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.03.2014Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/14]
12.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
21.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
21.10.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination31.10.2016Appeal received No.  T0976/17
24.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.05.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
15.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
08.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
16.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]FR2494471  (PFISTER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6-9,11-14 * the whole document * [I] 3,5,10;
 [XI]EP0584895  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,6-8,11-14 * the whole document * [I] 2-5,9,10;
 [XI]US2009213223  (KONG XIANG-YUN [CN]) [X] 1,6-8,11-14 * the whole document * [I] 2-5,9,10;
 [XI]US5508721  (HATTORI HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1,6-8,11-14 * the whole document * [I] 2-5,9,10;
 [XI]BE902443  (HARD & SOFT ENGINEERING) [X] 1,8,11,14 * the whole document * [I] 2-7,9,10,12,13;
 [A]DE102007048608  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [AD]EP2405317  (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE4332143  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *
by applicantEP2273369
 EP0856792
 DE4332143
 EP2405317